Bank of America, N.A. v. Alley et al

Counter_defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Defendant: Bethel Village Condominium Association, Sarah L. Alley, John Doe and Franklin County Treasurer
Counter_claimant: Sarah L. Alley
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2011cv00881
Filed: October 4, 2011
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Referring Judge: Norah McCann King
Presiding Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 23, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 19 Motion to Strike; granting 21 plaintiff's Motion to Amend; granting 19 Motion for Attorney Fees associated with the Answer and Counterclaims, the response to the Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims and the Motion to Strike. Defendant Alley is granted fourteen days in which to amend her answer and counterclaims. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 7/23/2012. (nmk0)
August 20, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER dismissing without prejudice 10 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Defendant's original counterclaims. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 08/20/2012. (dh1)
August 1, 2013 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: To afford the parties a limited time to explore the potential for a loan modification, the Court orders the 09/11/13 Mediation Conference vacated. The parties are directed to file a Joint Status Report discussing progress regarding a loan mo dification on 10/04/13. For administrative purposes, Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Defendant's Amended Counterclaim 33 is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff incorporates its Motion to Dismiss the Amended Counterclaim within its pending Motion for Summary Judgment 56 . The Court will reach the merits of the Motion to Dismiss when it addresses the Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 08/01/2013. (dh1)
February 11, 2014 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: An In-person Status Conference is scheduled for 02/20/14 at 10:00 a.m. The trial attorney for each party must attend the conference and the parties or principles shall be present. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 02/11/2014. (dh1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of America, N.A. v. Alley et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Carullo
Represented By: Monica Levine Lacks
Represented By: James Scott Wertheim
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bethel Village Condominium Association
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah L. Alley
Represented By: Melanie A Mills
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franklin County Treasurer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Sarah L. Alley
Represented By: Melanie A Mills
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: James Scott Wertheim
Represented By: Monica Levine Lacks
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Carullo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]