Clark v. Britton

Defendant: Ryan Britton
Plaintiff: Misty Clark
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv00980
Filed: November 2, 2011
 
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Columbus Office
County: UNION
Referring Judge: Mark R. Abel
Presiding Judge: Edmund A Sargus
 
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
November 13, 2012 12 Featured Case ORDER: December 12, 2012 settlement mediation is CANCELLED, a copy of this order will be mailed/emailed to mediator Daniel Ryan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 11/13/12. (sh1)
March 4, 2013 14 Featured Case Discovery Dispute Conference Order; counsel participated in a telephone discovery dispute conf w/ Judge Abel on 3/1/13. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 3/4/13. (sh1)
April 16, 2013 26 Featured Case ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 9/17/2013 at 9:30 AM; Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/17/2013 at 9:00 AM; and Jury Trial set for 10/28/2013 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 04/16/2013. (Attachment: FPTO Form) (dh1)
April 19, 2013 28 Featured Case ORDER granting 16 Motion to Compel; denying 27 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 4/19/13. (sh1)
May 2, 2013 32 Featured Case STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER in re: confidential information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 5/2/13. (sh1)
August 12, 2013 41 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 31 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ryan Britton be DENIED; Objections to R&R due by 8/29/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 8/12/13. (sh1)
December 17, 2013 47 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER granting 43 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Untimely Response to Objection. The Court overrules 42 Defendant's Objection to the Report and Recommendation and adopts 41 the Magistrate Judge's Report and Rec ommendation with the modifications stated in the Opinion and Order. The Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 31 is denied. The Clerk is directed to set a status conference in this action. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 12/17/2013. (dh1)
February 4, 2014 50 Featured Case ORDER vacating the telephone status conference scheduled for 02/11/14. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 02/04/2014. (dh1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Clark v. Britton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Britton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Misty Clark
Represented By: David A Singleton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]