Painter-Payne et al v. Vesta West Bay, LLC

Defendant: Vesta West Bay, LLC
Plaintiff: Lena M Painter-Payne and Christopher Painter
Case Number: 2:2012cv00912
Filed: October 4, 2012
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Presiding Judge: James L Graham
Referring Judge: Norah McCann King
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42:405 Fair Housing Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 16, 2014 108 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER. Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike, ECF 94 , is GRANTED. West Bays MSJ-Painter, ECF 50 , is GRANTED, West Bay's MSJ-Painter-Payne, ECF 51 , is GRANTED, and Plaintiffs' MSJ, ECF 60 , is DENIED. Plaintiffs' claims u nder the Fair Housing Act are DISMISSED with prejudice; plaintiff Painter's state law claim for defamation is DISMISSED without prejudice. The Court declines to address the merits of Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 9/16/2014. (pes1)
January 8, 2014 76 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 63 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 1/7/2014. (pes1)
April 21, 2014 79 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 59 Motion for Sanctions; denying 67 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 4/21/2014. (pes1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Painter-Payne et al v. Vesta West Bay, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vesta West Bay, LLC
Represented By: Acacia Marie Perko
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lena M Painter-Payne
Represented By: Alexander Morris Spater
Represented By: Tamara R Parker
Represented By: C. Raphael Davis-Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Painter
Represented By: C. Raphael Davis-Williams
Represented By: Tamara R Parker
Represented By: Alexander Morris Spater
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]