Baile-Bairead, LLC v. Magnum Land Services, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Baile-Bairead, LLC
Defendant: Magnum Land Services, LLC and Belmont Resources, LLC
Counter_claimant: Belmont Resources, LLC
Counter_defendant: Baile-Bairead, LLC
Case Number: 2:2012cv00957
Filed: October 16, 2012
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Columbus Office
County: WASHINGTON
Referring Judge: Mark R. Abel
Presiding Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 20, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 7/1/2014 at 9:30 AM; Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/31/2014 at 9:00 AM; and Jury Trial set for 8/11/2014 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 03/20/2014. (Attachment: FPTO Form) (dh1)
April 25, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE: Settlement Conference set for 7/1/2014 at 9:30 AM; Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/4/2014 at 9:00 AM; and Jury Trial set for 9/15/2014 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 04/25/2014. (dh1)
May 13, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting 24 Belmont's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment as to Baile-Bairead's Complaint and Count 1 of Belmont's Counterclaims. The Court concludes that there are still issues of material fact regarding Count 2 of Belmont's Counterclaims. Thus, 23 Baile-Bairead's Motion for Summary Judgment as to its Complaint and Counts 1 and 2 of Belmont's Counterclaims is denied. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 05/13/2014. (dh1)
June 30, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: This case has been reported as settled, therefore the trial schedule and associated dates are vacated. The parties are directed to file a stipulation of dismissal within 21 days of this Order. If the parties fail to do so, they are directed to contact the Court. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 06/30/2014. (dh1)
July 22, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The parties have indicated they need additional time to file a stipulation of dismissal in this case. They are directed to file a stipulation of dismissal within 14 days of this Order. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 07/22/14. (dh1)
August 5, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The parties have indicated they need additional time to file a stipulation of dismissal in this case. They are DIRECTED to file a stipulation of dismissal within 14 days of this Order. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 08/05/2014. (dh1)
August 18, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court Agreed Order and Stipulation of Dismissal, with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 08/18/2014. (dh1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baile-Bairead, LLC v. Magnum Land Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baile-Bairead, LLC
Represented By: Kristi Kress Wilhelmy
Represented By: Amanda Jo Stacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magnum Land Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belmont Resources, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Charles Wager
Represented By: John Kistler Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Belmont Resources, LLC
Represented By: John Kistler Keller
Represented By: Christopher Charles Wager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Baile-Bairead, LLC
Represented By: Amanda Jo Stacy
Represented By: Kristi Kress Wilhelmy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.