APPA Seafood, Inc. v. Obetz Transportation, Inc. et al

Defendant: Obetz Transportation, Inc., Fire & Ice Transport, LLC and Devinder Singh
Plaintiff: APPA Seafood, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2012cv01095
Filed: November 28, 2012
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Referring Judge: Terence P Kemp
Presiding Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Interstate Commerce Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 8, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 17 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment without prejudice, as Plaintiff has failed to request an entry of default from the Clerk pursuant to Rule 55(a). Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 05/08/2013. (dh1)
April 10, 2014 56 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting 42 Motion for Summary Judgment & denying 50 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P Kemp on 4/10/2014. (kk2)
May 16, 2014 57 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying without prejudice 28 APPA's Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus on 05/16/2014. (dh1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: APPA Seafood, Inc. v. Obetz Transportation, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Obetz Transportation, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fire & Ice Transport, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devinder Singh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: APPA Seafood, Inc.
Represented By: Clare R Taft
Represented By: Eric Larson Zalud
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]