Hawkins v. Franklin County Sheriff's Office et al

Plaintiff: Aaron L. Hawkins
Defendant: Franklin County Sheriff's Office, Zack Scott, Paul S. Wells, Jr., Joseph Wagner, Kevin O'Brien, Richard Kinietz, John an Jane Doe # 1-10 and Douglas Robinson
Case Number: 2:2013cv00186
Filed: March 1, 2013
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Presiding Judge: Michael H. Watson
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 29, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 23 Show Cause Order: The Magistrate Judge RECOMMENDS that the Court impose the sanction of default judgment against Defendant Wells in an amount to be determined by the Court. Objections to R&R due within fourteen days of the date of this Report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 4/29/2014. (er1)
May 27, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION and ORDER ADOPTING 28 the REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 5/27/14. (jk1)
April 14, 2015 45 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 1 Complaint. It is RECOMMENDED that theCourt enter default judgment against Defendant Wells in the amount of $180,654.90. Objections to R&R due by 5/1/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 4/14/2015. (mas1)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hawkins v. Franklin County Sheriff's Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron L. Hawkins
Represented By: Steven Douglas Rowe
Represented By: Andrew Peter Schabo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franklin County Sheriff's Office
Represented By: Sean T McCullough
Represented By: Scott Oliver Sheets
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zack Scott
Represented By: Sean T McCullough
Represented By: Scott Oliver Sheets
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul S. Wells, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Wagner
Represented By: Sean T McCullough
Represented By: Scott Oliver Sheets
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin O'Brien
Represented By: Sean T McCullough
Represented By: Scott Oliver Sheets
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Kinietz
Represented By: Sean T McCullough
Represented By: Scott Oliver Sheets
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John an Jane Doe # 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Robinson
Represented By: Sean T McCullough
Represented By: Scott Oliver Sheets
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]