Johnson v. Wyeth LLC et al

Defendant: Schwarz Pharma, Inc., Schwarz Pharma AG, Wyeth LLC, Alaven Pharmaceutical, LLC, Pfizer Inc, Wyeth Pharmaceuticals Inc, Baxter Healthcare Corporation, UCB GMBH, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Brenn Distribution, Inc. and John Doe Defendants
Plaintiff: Karen Johnson
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00267
Filed: March 21, 2013
 
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Columbus Office
County: ROSS
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Presiding Judge: Michael H. Watson
 
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 20, 2013 58 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Transfer [#39] is GRANTED. The case, Dube v. Wyeth, 4:12CV01912 ERW shall be transfered to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida. The consolidate d cases listed in Appendix A, attached to this Memorandum and Order, and incorporated herein by reference, shall be transferred to the appropriate home state forum of the individual plaintiffs. Terminate Case. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on March 20, 2103. (MCB) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 3/21/2013.]
September 16, 2013 87 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 86 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution: The Magistrate Judge RECOMMENDS that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss be GRANTED and that this action be DISMISSED for failure to prosecute. Objections to R&R due within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 9/16/2013. (er1)
November 13, 2013 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 87 the Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 11/13/13. (jk1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Johnson v. Wyeth LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schwarz Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Gerard T. Noce
Represented By: Beth A. Bauer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schwarz Pharma AG
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyeth LLC
Represented By: Charna E Sherman
Represented By: Gerard T. Noce
Represented By: Beth A. Bauer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alaven Pharmaceutical, LLC
Represented By: Gerard T. Noce
Represented By: Beth A. Bauer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc
Represented By: Charna E Sherman
Represented By: Gerard T. Noce
Represented By: Beth A. Bauer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyeth Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Charna E Sherman
Represented By: Gerard T. Noce
Represented By: Beth A. Bauer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baxter Healthcare Corporation
Represented By: Scott D. Bjorseth
Represented By: David A. Schott
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UCB GMBH
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Natalie J. Kussart
Represented By: Andrew D Ryan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenn Distribution, Inc.
Represented By: Robert W Hojnoski
Represented By: Steven P Sanders
Represented By: Ross S. Titzer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Defendants
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Johnson
Represented By: Jeffrey J Lowe
Represented By: Jacob A. Flint
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]