Tri County Wholesale Distributors, Inc. et al v. Labatt USA Operating Co., LLC et al

Plaintiff: Tri County Wholesale Distributors, Inc. and The Bellas Company
Defendant: Labatt USA Operating Co., LLC, Cerveceria Costa Rica, S.A., North American Breweries Holdings, LLC and John Does 1-10
Case Number: 2:2013cv00317
Filed: April 4, 2013
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Columbus Office
County: JEFFERSON
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Presiding Judge: Algenon L. Marbley
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 19, 2015 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Trial set for 4/7/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Columbus before Judge Algenon L. Marbley. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/1/2015 immediately after settlement conference at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Judge Algenon L. Marbley. Settlement Conference set for 4/1/2015 10:00 AM in Chambers before Judge Algenon L. Marbley. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 2/19/2015. (cw)
October 16, 2013 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 9 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 10/16/2013. (cw)
January 6, 2014 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 23 Motion to Certify Questions to the Supreme Court. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 1/6/2014. (cw)
January 6, 2014 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 27 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 1/6/2014. (cw)
August 14, 2014 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 58 Motion to Vacate the Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 8/14/2014. (cw)
December 11, 2014 91 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION and ORDER granting 78 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 80 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 12/11/2014. (cw)
February 12, 2015 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 92 Motion for Certificate of Appealability. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 2/12/2015. (cw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tri County Wholesale Distributors, Inc. et al v. Labatt USA Operating Co., LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tri County Wholesale Distributors, Inc.
Represented By: David Warren Alexander
Represented By: Christopher Haas
Represented By: Emily Elizabeth Root
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Bellas Company
Represented By: David Warren Alexander
Represented By: Christopher Haas
Represented By: Emily Elizabeth Root
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Labatt USA Operating Co., LLC
Represented By: Christopher C Koehler
Represented By: James B Niehaus
Represented By: Lindsey Carr Siegler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cerveceria Costa Rica, S.A.
Represented By: Christopher C Koehler
Represented By: James B Niehaus
Represented By: Lindsey Carr Siegler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North American Breweries Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Christopher C Koehler
Represented By: James B Niehaus
Represented By: Lindsey Carr Siegler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.