Hill v. Homeward Residential, Inc.

Plaintiff: Stephen M Hill
Defendant: Homeward Residential, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2013cv00388
Filed: April 23, 2013
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Columbus Office
County: DELAWARE
Referring Judge: Mark R. Abel
Presiding Judge: Gregory L Frost
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 20, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Abel on 3/20/2014. (Abel, Mark)
August 19, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 19 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 26 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Gregory L Frost on 8/19/14. (kn)
October 14, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 38 Motion to Quash. Signed by Judge Gregory L Frost on 10/14/14. (kn)
October 16, 2014 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 44 Motion to Quash. Signed by Judge Gregory L Frost on 10/16/14. (kn)
October 16, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - re 47 Objection (non motion) filed by Homeward Residential, Inc.. Signed by Judge Gregory L Frost on 10/16/14. (kn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. Homeward Residential, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen M Hill
Represented By: Troy John Doucet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homeward Residential, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.