Beavers v. Franklin County Adult Probation et al

Defendant: Franklin County Adult Probation and Mike DeWine
Plaintiff: Kevin Beavers
Case Number: 2:2013cv00404
Filed: April 26, 2013
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Referring Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Presiding Judge: Algenon L. Marbley
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 9, 2014 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting re 9 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 5/9/2014. (cw)
December 23, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 6 Motion to Dismiss the Ohio Attorney General as Party-Respondent. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley on 12/23/2013. (cw)
April 21, 2014 9 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Kevin Beavers. Objections to R&R due by 5/8/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 4/21/2014. (sln1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beavers v. Franklin County Adult Probation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franklin County Adult Probation
Represented By: Barbara Ann Farnbacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike DeWine
Represented By: Stephanie L Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Beavers
Represented By: Adam Boyd Bleile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.