Orrand et al v. Donley's Inc

Defendant: Donley's Inc
Plaintiff: Trustees of Ohio Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Plan Ohio Operating Engineers Pension Fund, Ohio Operating Engineers Apprenticeship Fund, and Ohio Operating Engineers Education and Safety Fund and Raymond Orrand
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00489
Filed: May 21, 2013
 
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Columbus Office
County: FRANKLIN
Referring Judge: Terence P Kemp
Presiding Judge: Algenon L. Marbley
 
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 16, 2013 28 Featured Case ORDER STAYING CASE pending a decision from the National Labor Relations Board in the contract dispute between the parties. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus, Algenon L Marbley, Gregory L Frost and James L Graham on 12/16/13. (sem1)
December 19, 2013 31 Featured Case ORDER denying 29 Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Edmund A Sargus, Jr, Algenon L Marbley, Gregory L Frost and James L Graham on 12/19/13. (sem1)
August 8, 2014 34 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER finding as moot 10 Motion to Dismiss; granting 19 Motion to Consolidate Cases; granting 20 Motion to Intervene; granting 20 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge James L Graham on 8/8/2014. (ds)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Orrand et al v. Donley's Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donley's Inc
Represented By: Meredith C Shoop
Represented By: Frank W Buck
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of Ohio Operating Engineers Health and Welfare Plan Ohio Operating Engineers Pension Fund, Ohio Operating Engineers Apprenticeship Fund, and Ohio Operating Engineers Education and Safety Fund
Represented By: Daniel J Clark
Represented By: Allen Shawn Kinzer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Orrand
Represented By: Daniel J Clark
Represented By: Allen Shawn Kinzer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]