Core v. Champaign County Board of County Commissioners

Plaintiff: Pamela Core
Defendant: Champaign County Board of County Commissioners
Case Number: 3:2011cv00166
Filed: May 17, 2011
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Dayton Office
County: CHAMPAIGN
Presiding Judge: Timothy S. Black
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 7, 2012 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING THE JOINT MOTION FOR EXTENSION (DOC. 28 ) AND AMENDING THE CALENDAR ORDER. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 3/7/12. (mr1)
April 2, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 25 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings. It is therefore respectfully recommended that the Renewed Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings be denied. Objections to R&R due by 4/19/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R Merz on 4/2/12. (cib1)
July 30, 2012 45 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION AND ENTRY: (1) ADOPTING IN PART AND MODIFYING IN PART THE DISPOSITION RECOMMENDED BY THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE IN THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS (DOC. 30 ); (2) OVERRULING IN PART AND SUSTAINING IN PART DEFENDANT'S OBJECTIONS (DOC. 31 ); AND (3) GRANTING DEFENDANT'S RENEWED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS ON THE ISSUE OF PUNITIVE DAMAGES AND DENYING THE REMAINDER (DOC. 25 ). Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 7/30/12. (mr1)
October 17, 2012 51 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION AND ENTRY GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Docs. 42 , 48 ). Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 10/17/2012. (mr1)
October 17, 2012 52 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT AFFIRMING 51 DECISION AND ENTRY. (mr1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Core v. Champaign County Board of County Commissioners
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Core
Represented By: John C Gerboth
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Champaign County Board of County Commissioners
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]