Churchill Downs Incorporated et al v. Dawson et al

Defendant: Jana Grosvenor, Meredith Grosvenor, Michael Marshall, Douglas Marshall, Jon Mieding and Emily Dawson
Plaintiff: Churchill Downs Technology Initiatives Company and Churchill Downs Incorporated
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00045
Filed: February 9, 2012
 
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Dayton Office
County: MIAMI
Presiding Judge: Timothy S. Black
 
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 12, 2012 15 Featured Case AGREED ORDER/ENTRY EXTENDING TIME TO FILE ANSWER. Douglas Marshall answer due 3/30/2021; Michael Marshall answer due 3/30/2021. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 3/12/12. (mr1)
June 25, 2012 40 Featured Case ORDER VACATING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND REQUIRING PLAINTIFFS TO COMPLY WITH LOCAL RULE 4.2(c). Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 6/25/12. (mr1)
June 11, 2013 58 Featured Case ORDER - This Order will memorialize Ms. Grosvenor's stated intention of invoking the Fifth Amendment concerning all questioning relevant to the facts, allegations and claims in this lawsuit, and the effect of this Order shall be the same as if the deposition had convened and Ms. Grosvenor invoked the Fifth Amendment under oath in response to the deposition questions posed by the parties. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 6/11/2013. (mr1)
December 4, 2013 75 Featured Case ORDER - Referral of this case to the undersigned Judicial Officer has expired; and, no motion or other matter in this case remains pending before theundersigned Judicial Officer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J Newman on 12/4/13. (pb1)
January 13, 2014 77 Featured Case AGREED ORDER regarding Jon Mieding's stated intention to invoke his Fifth Amendment rights. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 1/13/2014. (mr1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Churchill Downs Incorporated et al v. Dawson et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jana Grosvenor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meredith Grosvenor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Marshall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Marshall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Mieding
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily Dawson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Churchill Downs Technology Initiatives Company
Represented By: Robert G Cohen
Represented By: Stephen Michael Miller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Churchill Downs Incorporated
Represented By: Stephen Michael Miller
Represented By: Robert G Cohen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]