Mullins v. Bank of America Corp.

Plaintiff: James R Mullins, Jr.
Defendant: Bank of America Corp.
Case Number: 3:2012cv00131
Filed: May 1, 2012
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Dayton Office
County: PREBLE
Presiding Judge: Timothy S. Black
Referring Judge: Michael R Merz
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 31, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE TO NAMED PLAINTIFF - James R. Mullins, Jr., is hereby notified that Bank of America Corp. has filed a motion to remand this case to the state court from which it was removed (Doc. No. 10 ). Mr. Mullins is hereby notified that under the Rule s of this Court he has twenty-four days from the date of service (that is, until June 25, 2012) to file a response to the Motion to Remand. The response must also be served on Bank of Americas counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R Merz on 05/31/12. (pb1)
June 22, 2012 14 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - For the foregoing reasons, the Motion to Remand 10 should be granted. Objections to R&R due by 7/9/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R Merz on 6/22/12. (kje1)
August 1, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION AND ENTRY: (1) ADOPTING THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE (Doc. 14 ); (2) REMANDING TO THE STATE COURT; AND (3) TERMINATING THIS CASE FROM THE DOCKET. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 8/1/12. (mr1)
August 1, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT AFFIRMING 16 DECISION AND ENTRY. (mr1)
August 16, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 20 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by James R Mullins, Jr. - It is therefore Recommended that this Court should therefore certify to the Sixth Circuit that the appeal is not taken in objective good faith and should not be permitted to proceed in forma pauperis. Objections to R&R due by 9/4/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R Merz on 08/16/12. (pb1)
September 24, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION AND ENTRY ADOPTING THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE (DOC. 21 ). Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 9/24/12. (mr1)
May 2, 2012 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO REMOVING PARTY - It is accordingly ORDERED that James Mullins, Jr., correct the deficiencies listed above and that he forthwith notify the Preble County Common Pleas Court that he filed nothing in this Court until May 1, 2012, and file a certificate with this Court that he has given such notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R Merz on 05/01/2012. (kf)
May 18, 2012 7 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 4 Complaint filed by James R Mullins, Jr. - It is respectfully recommended that this case be dismissed without prejudice for want of prosecution and failure to comply with the Courts Order Objections to R&R due by 6/4/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R Merz on 05/17/12. (pb1)
May 24, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 8 , 5 the Report and Recommendations of May 18, 2012, is WITHDRAWN. The Court will accordingly not engage in further analysis of the filings sua sponte, but will await further filings from the parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R Merz on 05/24/12. (pb1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mullins v. Bank of America Corp.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James R Mullins, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corp.
Represented By: Erin Marie Laurito
Represented By: Jeffrey V Laurito
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]