Alterna Mortgage Income Fund, LLC v. GS Holdings-Brookside, Ltd. et al

Defendant: Ronald McCarthy, Roto-Rooter Services Company, JGR Properties, Inc., Clark County Auditor, GS Holdings-Brookside, Ltd., Forest Lake Campground and R.V. Center, LLC, Anthony M Sansalone and Clark County Treasurer
Plaintiff: Alterna Mortgage Income Fund, LLC
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00252
Filed: July 27, 2012
 
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Dayton Office
County: CLARK
Presiding Judge: Timothy S. Black
Referring Judge: Sharon L Ovington
 
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
November 21, 2012 39 Featured Case DECISION AND ENTRY DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANTS ROTO-ROOTER AND GS HOLDINGS-BROOKSIDE, LTD. (DOC. 29 ) WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO REFILING. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 11/21/12. (mr1)
February 25, 2013 47 Featured Case DECISION AND ENTRY GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT (Doc. 43 ). The Court GRANTS default judgment in favor of Plaintiff against Defendant GS Holdings Brookside in the amount of $2,908,250.00, plus prejudgment and post judg ment interest. With regard to Defendant Roto-Rooter Service Company, based on its default, the Court will enter judgment forever barring Roto-Rooter Service Company from asserting any claim with regard to the subject property. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 2/25/2013. (mr1)
August 8, 2013 64 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTION OF RECEIVER FOR APPROVAL OF (1) SALE OF ASSETS FREE AND CLEAR OF LIENS, CLAIMS AND ENCUMBRANCES AND INTERESTS; BY AUCTION; (2) FORM OF PURCHASE AGREEMENT; AND (3) OTHER RELATED RELIEF. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 8/8/2013. (mr1)
August 27, 2013 66 Featured Case DECISION AND ENTRY GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT (Doc. 57 ) AGAINST DEFENDANTS JGR PROPERTIES AND FOREST LAKE CAMPGROUND AND RV CENTER. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 8/26/2013. (mr1)
August 28, 2013 67 Featured Case JUDGMENT in a CIVIL CASE re: Decision and Entry (Docs. 43 , 57 ) (1) Roto-Rotor Service Company is forever barred from asserting any claim with regard to the subject property; and (2) Alterna Mortgage Income Fund, LLC is granted default judgment a gainst GS Holdings-Brookside, LTD in the amount of $2,908,250.00 plus prejudgment and post judgment interest; and (3) Forest Lake Campground and RV Center is barred from asserting any claim in this case and foreclosing Forest Lakes rights to the subject property, specifically its equity of redemption in the subject property; and, (4) JGR Properties is forever barred from asserting any claim with regard to the subject property. (mr1)
November 4, 2013 69 Featured Case DECISION AND ENTRY GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Doc. 62 ) AGAINST DEFENDANTS METZGER, FEDERER, SANSALONE AND MCCARTY DBA MCCARTY PUMP SERVICE. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 11/4/2013. (mr1)
November 4, 2013 70 Featured Case CLERK'S JUDGMENT AFFIRMING DECISION AND ENTRY 69 . (mr1)
December 6, 2013 73 Featured Case ORDER CONFIRMING SALE BY RECEIVER OF ASSETS FREE AND CLEAR OF LIENS, CLAIMS, ENCUMBRANCES, AND INTERESTS. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 12/5/2013. (mr1)
December 6, 2013 74 Featured Case CLERK'S JUDGMENT AFFIRMING ORDER 73 . (mr1)
February 3, 2014 78 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO TERMINATE RECEIVERSHIP (Doc. 76 ). Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 2/3/2014. (mr1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Alterna Mortgage Income Fund, LLC v. GS Holdings-Brookside, Ltd. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald McCarthy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roto-Rooter Services Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JGR Properties, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark County Auditor
Represented By: William D Hoffman
Represented By: Andrew Parker Pickering
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GS Holdings-Brookside, Ltd.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forest Lake Campground and R.V. Center, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony M Sansalone
Represented By: Charles M Miller
Represented By: Daniel E Izenson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark County Treasurer
Represented By: William D Hoffman
Represented By: Andrew Parker Pickering
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alterna Mortgage Income Fund, LLC
Represented By: Jesse R Lipcius
Represented By: Reuel D Ash
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]