Ride, Inc et al v. Bowshier et al

Defendant: Jalin Nautical LLC, Wild Rides Inc, Sky River LTD, Jack A Bowshier, Jack D Bowshier and Just Wheels Used Cars Inc
Plaintiff: Ride, Inc and Cycles Unlimited LLC
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00271
Filed: August 7, 2012
 
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Dayton Office
County: CLARK
Presiding Judge: Timothy S. Black
 
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 29, 2013 30 Featured Case ORDER: (1) DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS (Doc. 18 ); and (2) DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO AMEND (Doc. 24 ) AS MOOT. Plaintiffs shall file an amended complaint with the spoliation allegation (Doc. 17 ) as ordered on February 5, 2013. The amended complaint shall be filed forthwith. Defendants shall file the amended answer, counterclaim, and third party complaint within 14 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 3/29/2013. (mr1)
September 24, 2013 43 Featured Case AGREED ORDER-ENTRY EXTENDING TIME FOR RESPONSIVE PLEADING OF PLAINTIFFS. Upon agreement of the parties, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the Plaintiffs shall have until October 14, 2013 to respond to the counterclaims filed by the Defendant. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 9/24/2013. (mr1)
October 15, 2013 45 Featured Case AGREED ORDER-ENTRY EXTENDING TIME FOR RESPONSIVE PLEADING OF PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 10/15/2013. (mr1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ride, Inc et al v. Bowshier et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jalin Nautical LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wild Rides Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sky River LTD
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack A Bowshier
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack D Bowshier
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Just Wheels Used Cars Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ride, Inc
Represented By: James M Hill
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cycles Unlimited LLC
Represented By: James M Hill
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]