DWS International, Inc. v. George William Job, et al

Plaintiff: DWS International, Inc.
Defendant: George William Job and Katherine Job
Case Number: 3:2012cv00339
Filed: October 11, 2012
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Dayton Office
County: MONTGOMERY
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Rose
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 05:552 Right to Privacy Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 9, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ENTRY AND ORDER DENYING THE JOB FAMILY TRUSTS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS (Doc. 15 ). Signed by Judge Thomas M Rose on 4/9/2013. (kf)
July 15, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Thomas M Rose on 7/15/13. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (ep)
August 27, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE: TERMINATION ENTRY. The Court having been advised by both parties that the above matter has been settled, IT IS ORDERED that this action is hereby DISMISSED, with prejudice as to the parties, provided that any of the parties may, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, reopen the action ifsettlement is not consummated. Signed by Judge Thomas M Rose on 8/27/13. (ep)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DWS International, Inc. v. George William Job, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DWS International, Inc.
Represented By: Erin Moosbrugger
Represented By: Dianne Frances Marx
Represented By: Toby K Henderson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George William Job
Represented By: Jason Hilliard
Represented By: Michael Wesley Hawkins
Represented By: Jessica Elizabeth Bauml
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Job
Represented By: Michael Wesley Hawkins
Represented By: Jessica Elizabeth Bauml
Represented By: Jason Hilliard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]