United States of America v. Real Property Known as 3492 Riva Court Beavercreek OH 45430 et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Real Property Known as 3492 Riva Court Beavercreek OH 45430, 2004 Ford Mustang VIN 1FAFP42R24F216739, 2005 Pontiac GTO VIN 6G2VX12U95L462299, 2006 Pontiac GTO VIN 6G2VX12U26L833630 and 4270 US Currency
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00359
Filed: October 26, 2012
 
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Dayton Office
County: GREENE
Presiding Judge: Timothy S. Black
 
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 21:881 Forfeiture Property - Real Estate
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 31, 2012 19 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO STRIKE (DOC. 17 ) re: Stipulation (Doc. 16). Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 12/31/12. (mr1)
June 5, 2013 33 Featured Case AGREED ORDER RE: DEFENDANT (1) REAL PROPERTY KNOWN AS 3492 RIVA COURT, BEAVERCREEK, OHIO 45430. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 6/5/2013. (mr1)
June 17, 2013 35 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING UNITED STATES' MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 6/17/2013. (mr1)
September 17, 2013 36 Featured Case AGREED ORDER AND DECREE OF FORFEITURE. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 9/17/2013. (mr1)
September 18, 2013 37 Featured Case AMENDED 36 AGREED ORDER AND DECREE OF FORFEITURE. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 9/18/2013. (mr1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: United States of America v. Real Property Known as 3492 Riva Court Beavercreek OH 45430 et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Pamela M Stanek
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property Known as 3492 Riva Court Beavercreek OH 45430
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2004 Ford Mustang VIN 1FAFP42R24F216739
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2005 Pontiac GTO VIN 6G2VX12U95L462299
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2006 Pontiac GTO VIN 6G2VX12U26L833630
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4270 US Currency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]