Stallsworth v. Cox et al

Defendant: Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Donn Paul Cox and Celadon Trucking Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Robert Stallsworth
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00064
Filed: March 4, 2013
 
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Dayton Office
County: CLARK
Presiding Judge: Timothy S. Black
 
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1446 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 7, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court CONDITIONAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL - The Court having been advised by Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington that this case has successfully mediated and settled in the Courts presence; It is ORDERED that this action is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice, prov ided that any of the parties may, upon good cause shown within 30 days, move to reopen the action if settlement is not consummated. Also, if desired, the parties may timely move to substitute a judgment entry contemplated by the settlement agreement. The Court expressly and explicitly retains jurisdiction to enforce the settlement agreement of the parties. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 2/7/2014. (mr1)
March 20, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court DISMISSAL ENTRY WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 3/20/2014. (mr1)
May 2, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION AND ENTRY DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR REMAND (Doc. 5 ) WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND ORDERING DEFENDANTS CELADON AND COX TO FILE AN AMENDED PETITION FOR REMOVAL. The Court ORDERS Defendants Celadon and Cox to file an amended petition for re moval within SEVEN days from the entry of this Order to allege and support the assertion that Allstate's joinder in or consent to removal was not required on the basis that Allstate was improperly joined as a defendant. Plaintiff may re-file a m otion to remand within FOURTEEN DAYS from the filing of the amended petition. Failure to file an amended petition for removal will result in this case being remanded for failure to comply with the procedural requirements of 28 U.S.C. § 1446(b). Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 5/2/2013. (mr1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Stallsworth v. Cox et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donn Paul Cox
Represented By: Matthew D. DiCicco
Represented By: Kevin Charles Connell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celadon Trucking Services, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Charles Connell
Represented By: Matthew D. DiCicco
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Stallsworth
Represented By: Andrew R. Tobergte
Represented By: Christopher John Snyder
Represented By: Kyle B McKenzie
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]