Jones v. Warden, Lebanon Correctional Institution

Petitioner: Robert L. Jones
Respondent: Warden, Lebanon Correctional Institution
Case Number: 3:2013cv00085
Filed: March 20, 2013
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Dayton Office
County: MONTGOMERY
Referring Judge: Michael R Merz
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Rose
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 12, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - It is respectfully recommended that the Petition herein be dismissed with prejudice. Because reasonable jurists would not disagree with this conclusion, Petitioner should be denied a certificate of appealability and the Court should certify to the Sixth Circuit that any appeal would be objectively frivolous. Objections to R&R due by 11/29/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R Merz on 11/12/2013. (kpf1)
January 8, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court RECOMMITTAL ORDER -The District Judge has preliminarily considered the Objections and believes they will be more appropriately resolved after further analysis by the Magistrate Judge. Accordingly, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(b)(3), this matter is hereby returned to the Magistrate Judge with instructions to file a supplemental report analyzing the Objections and Response and making recommendations based on that analysis. Signed by Judge Thomas M Rose on 1-8-2014. (de)
January 13, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - It is again respectfully recommended that the Petition be dismissed with prejudice. Because reasonable jurists would not disagree with this conclusion, Petitioner should be denied a certificate of appealability and the Court should certify to the Sixth Circuit that any appeal would be objectively frivolous. Objections to R&R due by 1/30/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R Merz on 1/13/2014. (kpf1)
March 26, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ENTRY AND ORDER OVERRULING JONES'S OBJECTIONS (Doc. #15)TO THE MAGISTRATE JUDGES REPORT ANDRECOMMENDATIONS; OVERRULING JONES'S OBJECTIONS TO THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS (Doc. # 19 ); ADOPTING THE MAG ISTRATEJUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS AND SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS (Docs. # 13 and 17 ) IN THEIR ENTIRETY; DISMISSING JONES'S PETITION FOR A WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS WITH PREJUDICE; DENYING ANY REQUESTED CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY; CERTIFYING THAT ANY APPEAL OF EITHER THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OR THE SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION WOULD BE OBJECTIVELY FRIVOLOUS AND TERMINATING THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Thomas M Rose on 3/25/14. (ep)
March 26, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT WITH NOTICE OF DISPOSAL ATTACHED. Signed on 3/26/14. (ep)
March 22, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - It is respectfully recommended that the Petition herein be dismissed with prejudice, Petitioner should be denied a certificate of appealability, and this Court should certify to the Sixth Circuit that any appeal would be objectively frivolous and should not be permitted to proceed in forma pauperis. Objections to R&R due by 4/8/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R Merz on 3/21/2013. (kpf1)
June 13, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court RECOMMITAL ORDER - This case is before the Court on Petitioner=s Objections (Doc. No. 5 ) to the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendations (Doc. No. 3 ). The District Judge has preliminarily considered the Objections and believes they wil l be more appropriately resolved after further analysis by the Magistrate Judge. Accordingly, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(b)(3), this matter is hereby returned to the Magistrate Judge with instructions to file a supplemental report analyzing the Objections and Response and making recommendations based on that analysis. Signed by Judge Thomas M Rose on 6/13/13. (kje1)
June 13, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER WITHDRAWING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 3 AND ORDERING ANSWER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R Merz on 6/13/13. (kje1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Warden, Lebanon Correctional Institution
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert L. Jones
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden, Lebanon Correctional Institution
Represented By: M Scott Criss
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]