Miller v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Carin Miller
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Equifax, Inc., Trans Union LLC, Wites & Kapetan, P.A., Infinity Marketing Solutions, Inc. and Doe Company Debt Collector
Case Number: 3:2013cv00090
Filed: March 26, 2013
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Dayton Office
County: MONTGOMERY
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Rose
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 13, 2015 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ENTRY AND ORDER OVERRULING MILLER'S MOTION TO STRIKE (Doc. 95 ) AND GRANTING TRANS UNIONS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Doc. 89 ): Miller is given until not later than fourteen (14) days following entry of this Order to renew a motion for defau lt judgment against Infinity. Failure to do so will result in the captioned cause being terminated upon the docket records of the United States District Court for the Southern District of Ohio, Western Division, at Dayton. Signed by Judge Thomas M Rose on 2/12/15. (ep)
February 19, 2015 102 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ENTRY AND ORDER OVERRULING MILLER'S MOTION TO STRIKE (Doc. 95 ) AND GRANTING TRANS UNION'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Doc. 89 ) - Plaintiff is given not later than fourteen (14) days following the entry of this Order to renew a motion for default judgment against Infinity. Failure to do so will result in the captioned cause being terminated. Signed by Judge Thomas M Rose on 2/19/15. (ep)
March 3, 2015 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ENTRY AND ORDER SETTING AN EVIDENTIARY HEARING - Evidentiary Hearing set for 4/9/2015 AT 10:30 AM in Courtroom 2 - Dayton before Judge Thomas M Rose. Signed by Judge Thomas M Rose on 3/3/15. (ep)
April 13, 2015 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ENTRY AND ORDER OVERRULING TRANS UNION'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND SANCTIONS (Doc. 105 ) WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO RENEWAL AFTER THE APPEALS PROCESS IS COMPLETE. Trans Union's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Sanctions Pursuant To Rule 11, 28 U.S.C. § 1927 and 15 U.S.C. § 1681 is overruled without prejudice to renewal. Trans Union may renew its motion, if it wishes, after the appeals process is complete. Signed by Judge Thomas M Rose on 4/13/15. (ep)
April 13, 2015 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ENTRY AND ORDER GRANTING MILLER'S RENEWED MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST INFINITY (Doc. 103 ) AND AWARDING $23,735 IN DAMAGES. Plaintiff's Renewed Motion for Default Judgment Against Infinity is granted. Plaintiff is awarded $23,735 in damages from Infinity. Signed by Judge Thomas M Rose on 4/13/15. (ep)
September 16, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 1 Complaint filed by Carin Miller. Plaintiffs time for filing proof of service or waiver expired July 29, 2013. Unless proof of service is filed by September 30, 2013, the Court will dismiss the defendant, Infinity Marketing Solutions, Inc., from this action for lack of service of process. Signed by Judge Thomas M Rose on 9/17/13. (ep)
February 14, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ENTRY AND ORDER DENYING MILLER'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST INFINITY (Doc. 26 ) WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Thomas M Rose on 2/12/14. (ep)
June 4, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: By June 11, 2014, Plaintiff shall re-file the draft pleading; confirm in a writing to be docketed that Plaintiff has produced all of the documents she has; produce a timeline of events giving rise to the claims here at issue; and shall prepar e new responses to Trans Union's discovery requests which comply in all respects with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. By June 11, 2014, all parties to this case shall sign a draft Protective Order and submit the document, in Word, to chambers (newman_chambers@ohsd.uscourts.gov) for the Court's review. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman on 6/4/2014. (jc1)
June 17, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J Newman on 06/17/14. (pb1)
June 20, 2014 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - 1. The parties shall provide memoranda summarizing their discovery disputes for the Court on or before Thursday, June 26, 2014. Such writings shall address the issues raised at the discovery hearing held on June 20, 2014, as well as any ot her outstanding discovery issues in this case. Responses to such filings, if any, shall be submitted to the Court on or before Wednesday, July 2, 2014; 2. Regarding Defendant Trans Unions Motion for Reconsideration (doc. 46 ), Plaintiffs response, if any, shall be due on or before Friday, June 27, 2014. Following this date, the Court shall consider this motion ripe and proceed to rule. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J Newman on 06/20/14. (pb1)
June 23, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT & RECOMMENDATION1 THAT: (1) THE PARTIES STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANTS, EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. AND WITES & KAPETAN, P.A., PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) (DOCS. 42, 43) BE CONSTRUED AS JOINT, UNOPPOSED MOTIONS TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 21; (2) BOTH MOTIONS BE GRANTED; AND (3) DEFENDANTS EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. AND WITES & KAPETAN, P.A. BE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Objections to R&R due by 7/10/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J Newman on 06/23/14. (pb1)
July 17, 2014 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 48 - The parties' two stipulations for voluntary dismissal with prejudice of defendants, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Wites & Kapetain, P.A. pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) [42, 43] be construed as joint, unopposed motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 21; both motions are granted and defendants Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Wites & Kapetan, P.A. are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Thomas M Rose on 7-17-2014. (de)
July 18, 2014 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION (DOC. 46 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J Newman on 07/18/14. (pb1)
July 21, 2014 60 Opinion or Order of the Court DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J Newman on 07/21/14. (pb1)
October 3, 2014 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ENTRY AND ORDER ESTABLISHING EXPEDITED BRIEFING SCHEDULES ON PENDING MOTIONS - re 72 Motion to Strike and 74 Motion for Sanctions filed by Carin Miller. Defendant Transunion is given until not later than October 10, 2014, to respond to both pending Motions, and Plaintiff Miller is given until not later than October 17, 2014 to reply. Signed by Judge Thomas M Rose on 10/2/14. (ep)
October 31, 2014 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 74 Motion for Sanctions Based on all of the foregoing, Millers motion for sanctions against Transunion for spoliation of evidence, doc. 74 , is DENIED. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J Newman on 10/31/2014. (ead1)
November 5, 2014 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ENTRY AND ORDER GRANTING MILLER'S MOTION TO STRIKE (Doc. 72 ) AND DENYING MILLER'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Doc. 63 )- Without evidence of willful noncompliance, Miller is not entitled to the requested summary judgment on her claim re garding the June 2014 Credit Report provided via discovery by Trans Union. Miller's Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. Since Miller is the Plaintiff in this lawsuit, this lawsuit remains to be adjudicated. Signed by Judge Thomas M Rose on 11/5/14. (ep)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carin Miller
Represented By: John A Fischer
Represented By: Sam S Han
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax, Inc.
Represented By: Patricia A Screen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: William R Brown
Represented By: William Madison Huse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wites & Kapetan, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Infinity Marketing Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Company Debt Collector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.