Wynn v. Evanhoe & Associates et al

Defendant: Charles Evanhoe, Heather Johnson, Martha Pendergrass, Evanhoe & Associates and Walter Schroeder
Plaintiff: Camilla Anita Wynn
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00094
Filed: March 28, 2013
 
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Dayton Office
County: MONTGOMERY
Referring Judge: Michael R Merz
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Rose
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 13, 2013 10 Featured Case ORDER: The Court held a third follow-up telephone conference with counsel for both sides on September 13, 2013. Plaintiffs counsel is ORDERED to produce all outstanding discovery no later than Friday, September 20, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael Newman on 9/13/13. (ea)
October 18, 2013 13 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - The Magistrate Judges Report and Recommendation dated September 25, 2013 12 is AFFIRMED; Plaintiffs Motion to Dismiss without prejudice 11 is GRANTED; and this matter is hereby TERMINATED on the docket of this Court. Signed by Judge Thomas M Rose on 10-18-2013. (de)
October 18, 2013 14 Featured Case CLERK'S JUDGMENT with Attached Notice of Disposal. Signed on 10/18/13. (pb1)
April 30, 2013 5 Featured Case ORDER VACATING PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRANSFERRING REFERENCE to Magistrate Judge Michael J Newman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R Merz on 4/30/13. (kje1)
May 1, 2013 6 Featured Case ORDER FOR PRELIMINARY PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 5/22/2013 at 01:30 PM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Michael J Newman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J Newman on 5/1/2013. (kf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Wynn v. Evanhoe & Associates et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Evanhoe
Represented By: Jeffrey S Hiller
Represented By: Brendan J Fitzgerald
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Johnson
Represented By: Brendan J Fitzgerald
Represented By: Jeffrey S Hiller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha Pendergrass
Represented By: Brendan J Fitzgerald
Represented By: Jeffrey S Hiller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evanhoe & Associates
Represented By: Jeffrey S Hiller
Represented By: Brendan J Fitzgerald
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Schroeder
Represented By: Brendan J Fitzgerald
Represented By: Jeffrey S Hiller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Camilla Anita Wynn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]