Easterling v. Second District Court of Appeals, Greene County

Defendant: Mary Donovan, Jeffrey Froelich, Mike T. Hall and Mike Fain
Plaintiff: Warren Easterling
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00106
Filed: April 9, 2013
 
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Dayton Office
County: GREENE
Presiding Judge: Timothy S. Black
Referring Judge: Michael R Merz
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 20, 2013 10 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 9 Amended Complaint, filed by Warren Easterling. Objections to R&R due by 7/8/2013. It is therefore respectfully recommended that the Amended Complaint be dismissed without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction as established by the Rooker-Feldman Doctrine. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R Merz on 6/19/2013. (kf)
July 25, 2013 16 Featured Case DECISION AND ENTRY: (1) ADOPTING THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE (Doc. 10 ); (2) OVERRULING PETITIONER'S OBJECTIONS TO THE DECISION AND ORDER DENYING PETITIONER'S MOTION TO AMEND (Doc. 15 ); AND (3) DISMISSING THE AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 7/25/2013. (mr1)
July 25, 2013 17 Featured Case CLERK'S JUDGMENT AFFIRMING DECISION AND ENTRY (Doc. 16 ). (mr1)
September 9, 2013 19 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS REGARDING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS ON APPEAL - It is respectfully recommended that Petitioner's pauper status on appeal be denied and his appeal certfied to the Sixth Circuit as objectively frivolous. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R Merz on 9/9/2013. (kpf1)
September 12, 2013 22 Featured Case RECOMMITTAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 9/12/2013. (mr1)
September 16, 2013 23 Featured Case SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS REGARDING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS ON APPEAL - It is again respectfully recommended that Petitioner be denied in forma pauperis status on appeal be denied and the Court certify to the Sixth Circuit that the a ppeal is objectively frivolous. If Judge Black adopts this recommendation, Petitioner has the right to ask the Sixth Circuit for in forma pauperis status. Objections to R&R due by 10/3/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R Merz on 9/16/2013. (kpf1)
October 18, 2013 25 Featured Case DECISION AND ENTRY: (1) ADOPTING THE REPORTS AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE (Docs. 19 , 23 ); (2) OVERRULING PETITIONER'S OBJECTIONS (Docs. 21 , 24 ); AND (3) DENYING PETITIONER PAUPER STAUTUS ON APPEAL AND CERITIFYING THAT APPEAL WOULD BE OBJECTIVELY FRIVOLOUS. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 10/18/2013. (mr1)
April 15, 2013 4 Featured Case TRANSFER ORDER - With the consent of each of them, the reference in the above-captioned action is hereby transferred from Chief Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Sharon L. Ovington and Magistrate Judge Michael R Merz on 4/15/13. (kje1)
April 17, 2013 5 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - re 2 - It is therefore respectfully recommended that this case be dismissed without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. The Clerk of Court is hereby ORDERED not to issue process in this case pending further order of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R Merz on 4/17/13. (kje1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Easterling v. Second District Court of Appeals, Greene County
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Donovan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Froelich
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike T. Hall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Fain
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warren Easterling
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]