United States of America v. 354 Narrows Trace, Beavercreek, Ohio, Real Property Located at

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: 354 Narrows Trace, Beavercreek, Ohio, Real Property Located at
Case Number: 3:2013cv00111
Filed: April 15, 2013
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Dayton Office
County: ADAMS
Presiding Judge: Timothy S. Black
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 08:1324 Aliens: Complaint for Forfeiture
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 31, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING UNITED STATES' MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS (Doc. 11 ). Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 5/31/2013. (mr1)
December 9, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - It is hereby ordered that the captioned cause be administrativelyprocessed. AO Processing/"Case stayed indefinitely at the request of Government pending resolution of related criminal prosecution." Signed by Judge Walter H Rice on 12/09/13. (pb1)
January 24, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 17 Motion to Lift Stay. Signed by Judge Walter H Rice on 01/24/14. (pb1)
January 24, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED ORDER AND DECREE OF FORFEITURE. Signed by Judge Walter H Rice on 01/24/14. (pb1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 354 Narrows Trace, Beavercreek, Ohio, Real Property Located at
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Pamela M Stanek
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 354 Narrows Trace, Beavercreek, Ohio, Real Property Located at
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]