Alahverdian v. Grebinski et al

Defendant: Mary J. Grebinski and Nathan M. Lanning
Plaintiff: Nicholas Alahverdian
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00132
Filed: April 29, 2013
 
Court: Ohio Southern District Court
Office: Dayton Office
County: MONTGOMERY
Referring Judge: Michael R Merz
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Rose
 
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 21, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS; ORDER FOR AMENDED COMPLAINT - It is respectfully recommended that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction as to the entire case be denied and Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Fourt h Claim for Relief for failure to state a claim should be GRANTED. Objections to R&R due by 11/7/2013. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file an amended complaint not later than November 1, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R Merz on 10/21/2013. (kpf1)
November 5, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STRIKING "FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT" signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R Merz on 11/4/2013. (kpf1)
April 29, 2013 2 Opinion or Order of the Court TRANSFER ORDER - With the consent of both of them and based on the pendency of Case No. 3:13-cv-113 before Magistrate Judge Merz, the reference herein is transferred from Magistrate Judge MichaelJ. Newman to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Merz. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R Merz on 04/29/13. (pb1)
May 19, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS - It is respectfully recommended that the Motion to Dismiss be granted and the Amended Complaint be dismissed with prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 6/5/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R Merz on 5/19/2014. (kpf1)
June 20, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court RECOMMITAL ORDER re 32 Objection to Magistrate Judge Order filed by Nicholas Alahverdian TO 30 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Mary J. Grebinski, Nathan M. Lanning. Signed by Judge Thomas M Rose on 6/20/14. (ep)
August 5, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - It is again respectfully recommended that the Amended Complaint be dismissed with prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 8/22/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R Merz on 8/5/2014. (kpf1)
August 6, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SANCTIONS - The appropriate sanction here is payment to Defendants of their reasonable attorney fees incurred in defending this action. The Court should require Plaintiff's counsel to make that payment. Objections to R&R due by 8/25/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R Merz on 8/5/2014. (kpf1)
September 8, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ENTRY AND ORDER OVERRULING ALAHVERDIAN'S OBJECTIONS (Doc. 32 ) TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE MERZ'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS REGARDING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TODISMISS (Doc. 30 ); OVERRULING ALAHVERDIAN'S OBJECTIONS (Doc. 36 ) TO MAGISTRAT E JUDGE MERZ'S SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS REGARDING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS (Doc. 34 ); ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGEMERZ'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS AND SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS REGARDING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS IN THEIR ENTIRETY AND DISMISSINGALAHVERDIAN'S AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Thomas M Rose on 9/8/14. (ep)
September 8, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ENTRY AND ORDER OVERRULING ALAHVERDIAN'S OBJECTIONS (Doc. 37 ) TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE MERZ'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS REGARDING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FORSANCTIONS (Doc. 35 ); ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE MERZ'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIO NS REGARDING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SANCTIONS IN ITS ENTIRETY; ORDERING ALAHVERDIAN'S COUNSEL TO PAY DEFENDANTS' THEIR REASONABLE ATTORNEYS' FEES INCURRED IN DEFENDING THIS ACTION AND TERMINATING THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Thomas M Rose on 9/8/14. (ep)
September 8, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT WITH NOTICE OF DISPOSAL ATTACHED.. Signed on 9/8/14. (ep)
June 12, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF UPON FILING OF MOTION TO DISMISS OR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael R Merz on 6/12/2013. (kpf1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Alahverdian v. Grebinski et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary J. Grebinski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan M. Lanning
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Alahverdian
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]