MAY v. CASH et al

Defendant: JASON KOPERA, STEVEN BURK, MICHAEL CASH, NORMAN WEIDLICH and JOHN SHEDLOCK
Plaintiff: EDWARD MAY
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00069
Filed: March 27, 2013
 
Court: Pennsylvania Western District Court
Office: Johnstown Office
County: Cambria
Referring Judge: Cynthia Reed Eddy
Presiding Judge: Kim R. Gibson
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 15, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 11 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; adopting 12 Report and Recommendation as the Opinion of the Court. It is further Ordered that this matter is remanded back to the magistrate judge for all further pretrial proceedings, and as more fully stated in said Memorandum Order. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 7/15/2013. (dlg)
January 23, 2014 62 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER - it is hereby Ordered that the Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant John Shedlock, D.O. (ECF No. 24 ) is GRANTED and all claims against Defendant Shedlock are dismissed with prejudice. It is further Ordered that the Report and Rec ommendation (ECF No. 55) is ADOPTED as the Opinion of the Court. It is further Ordered that this matter is remanded back to the magistrate judge for all further pretrial proceedings, and as more fully stated in said Memorandum Order. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 1/23/2014. (dlg)
June 27, 2014 77 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 46 Motion to Dismiss or, in the alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants Michael Cash, D.O., Steven Burk, P.A., Jason Kopera, R.N., Normal Weidlich, Jeannette Nagy, pharmacists, and A nthony Pazcoquin (collectively referred to as the "Federal Defendants") be granted with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Report and Recommendation (ECF. No. 71 ) dated April 21, 2014, is ADOPTED as the Opinion of the Court. IT I S FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court mark this case CLOSED. AND IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that pursuant to Rule 4(a)(1) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure, Plaintiff has thirty (30) days to file a notice of appeal as provided by Rule 3 ofthe Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure, and as more fully stated in said Memorandum Order. Signed by Judge Kim R. Gibson on 6/27/2014. (dlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: MAY v. CASH et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JASON KOPERA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN BURK
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL CASH
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORMAN WEIDLICH
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN SHEDLOCK
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD MAY
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]