Boyd et al v. Sysco Corporation et al

Defendant: Sysco Corporation, Sysco Corporation Group Benefit Plan and United Behavioral Health
Plaintiff: Whitfield R Boyd and Wayne Boyd
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv00599
Filed: March 6, 2013
 
Court: South Carolina District Court
Office: Florence Office
County: Florence
Presiding Judge: R Bryan Harwell
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 3, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on 15 Motion for Discovery. The Court finds that limited discovery should be allowed as set forth herein. All discovery is to be completed by 9/1/2014. Should defense counsel believe that a protective order is necessary regarding this discovery, they should submit a consent protective order to the Court. Signed by the Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 7/3/2014. (hcic, )
August 18, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by the Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 8/18/2014. (hcic, )</b
November 10, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 27 Motion to Compel; denying 28 Motion to Deem Requests Admitted; denying as moot 32 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 11/10/2014. (hcic, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Boyd et al v. Sysco Corporation et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sysco Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sysco Corporation Group Benefit Plan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Behavioral Health
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Whitfield R Boyd
Represented By: Blaney A Coskrey, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Boyd
Represented By: Blaney A Coskrey, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]