DietGoal Innovations LLC v. Arby's Restaurant Group, Inc. et al Featured Case

Counter_claimant: Kraft Foods Inc., Rodale, Inc. and Doctor's Associates Inc
Defendant: ABP Corporation, Bojangle's Restaurants Inc., CHICK-FIL-A, INC., CKE Restaurants Inc, Culver Franchising System, Inc., Doctor's Associates Inc, International Dairy Queen,Inc., DineWise Inc., Dunkin' Brands Group, Inc., EPL Intermediate Inc, Google Inc., Jack in the Box Inc., Jimmy John's Franchise LLC, McDonald's Corporation, Panda Restaurant Group, Inc., Arby's Restaurant Group, Inc., Taco Bell Corp., TCBY Enterprises, Inc., The Television Food Network GP, Wawa, Inc., Wegmans Food Markets, Inc., Wendy's International, Inc., Whole Foods Market, Inc., Bon Appetit Management Company, Daily Burn, Inc., Hearst Communications, Inc. d/b/a Seventeen Magazine, Darden Restaurants Inc, InterActiveCorp, Kraft Foods Inc., QIP Holder LLC d/b/a Quiznos, Red Robin International, Inc., Rodale, Inc., Tim Hortons Inc., Tim Hortons USA Inc., Weight Watchers International, Inc., Accord, Inc. d/b/a Taco Time Northwest, MOE'S FRANCHISOR, LLC, Davanni's, Inc., Rubio's Restaurants, Inc., Sweetgreen, Inc., Domino's Pizza, Inc., Starbucks Corporation, Panda Express, Inc. and Sonic Corp.
Plaintiff: DietGoal Innovations LLC
Counter_defendant: DietGoal Innovations LLC
Case Number: 2:2011cv00418
Filed: September 15, 2011
Court: Texas Eastern District Court
Office: Marshall Office
County: Travis
Presiding Judge: David Folsom
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 6, 2012 Weight Watchers International, Inc. terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 6/6/12. (bas)
June 6, 2012 449 Featured Case ORDER OF DISMISSAL regarding 448 Notice of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by DietGoal Innovations LLC as to Defendant Weight Watchers International, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 6/6/12. (bas)
June 5, 2012 448 NOTICE by DietGoal Innovations LLC Agreed Notice of Dismissal of Defendant Weight Watchers International, Inc. With Prejudice (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Joe, Christopher)
May 24, 2012 447 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Chad Brian Walker on behalf of Doctor's Associates Inc (Walker, Chad)
May 24, 2012 446 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Chad Brian Walker on behalf of Red Robin International, Inc. (Walker, Chad)
May 24, 2012 445 Featured Case ORDER denying 434 Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 5/24/12. (bas)
May 21, 2012 444 ANSWER to 438 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim DietGoal Innovations LLC's Answer to Defendant WHole Foods Market, Inc.'s Counterclaims by DietGoal Innovations LLC.(Joe, Christopher)
May 21, 2012 443 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Monica Nguyen Tavakoli on behalf of DietGoal Innovations LLC (Tavakoli, Monica)
May 18, 2012 442 NOTICE by Daily Burn, Inc., InterActiveCorp, The Television Food Network GP re 308 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Joinder NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Blackburn, James)
May 10, 2012 441 Featured Case ORDER granting 440 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by DietGoal Innovations LLC. Bon Appetit Management Company terminated. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 5/10/12. (mrm, )
May 9, 2012 440 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by DietGoal Innovations LLC (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bukovcan, Niknaz)
April 27, 2012 439 REPLY to Response to Motion re 434 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Motion For Leave To File Third Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement Plaintiff DietGoal Innovations LLC's Reply to Defendant Rodale, Inc.'s Opposition to DietGoal's Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement filed by DietGoal Innovations LLC. (Bukovcan, Niknaz)
April 25, 2012 438 Whole Foods Market, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint Third Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against DietGoal Innovations LLC by Whole Foods Market, Inc..(Roth, Brendan)
April 17, 2012 437 RESPONSE in Opposition re 434 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Motion For Leave To File Third Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement filed by Rodale, Inc.. (Smith, Kevin)
April 12, 2012 436 NOTICE of Change of Address by Eric William Buether (Buether, Eric)
April 3, 2012 435 AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement against Allrecipes.com, Inc., Bravo Media LLC (Division of NBC Universal Media, LLC), CalorieKing Wellness Solutions, Inc., ConAgra Foods, Inc., Scripps Network, LLC d/b/a Food.com, General Mills Sales, Inc., Meredith Corporation, Nestle USA, Inc., Nutrisystem, Inc., SparkPeople, Inc., Taco Mayo Franchise Systems, Inc., Time Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., WebMD, LLC, Whataburger Restaurants LLC, filed by DietGoal Innovations LLC.(Bukovcan, Niknaz)
April 3, 2012 434 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Motion For Leave To File Third Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement by DietGoal Innovations LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bukovcan, Niknaz) (Attachment 2 (proposed order) replaced on 4/4/2012) (sm, ).
April 2, 2012 433 Featured Case ORDER granting 432 Motion to Withdraw atty Deborah E Lewis of White & Wiggins. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 4/2/2012. (sm, )
April 2, 2012 432 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Deborah E. Lewis and White & Wiggins, L.L.P. from the representation of Kraft Foods Inc. by Kraft Foods Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Roberts, Gerald)
April 1, 2012 431 NOTICE of Change of Address by Gerald Wayne Roberts (Roberts, Gerald)
March 30, 2012 430 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 373 MOTION to Sever and in Addition or in the Alternative to Dismiss for Improper Venue or Transfer to the Central District of California Plaintiff Dietgoal Innovations LLCs Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendant El Pollo Loco Inc.s Reply in Support of its Motion to Sever Or in the Alternative to Dismiss filed by DietGoal Innovations LLC. (Bukovcan, Niknaz)
March 29, 2012 429 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 381 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction) Plaintiff DietGoal Innovations LLC's Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendant Rubio Restaurants, Inc.'s Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by DietGoal Innovations LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Bukovcan, Niknaz)
March 23, 2012 428 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Paul J Cronin for Dunkin' Brands Group, Inc.,Paul J Cronin for Dunkin' Brands Group, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1008) (ehs, )
March 23, 2012 427 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Eugene A Feher for Dunkin' Brands Group, Inc.,Eugene A Feher for Dunkin' Brands Group, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-1006) (ehs, )
March 23, 2012 426 Featured Case ORDER granting 425 Motion to Stay all deadlines related to Weight Watchers for sixty days and FURTHER ORDERED to file dismissal papers or notify court that settlement has been effected within sixty days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 3/23/2012. (sm, )
March 23, 2012 425 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Plaintiff DietGoal Innovations LLC's Unopposed Motion to Stay All Deadlines with Respect to Weight Watchers International, Inc. by DietGoal Innovations LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bukovcan, Niknaz)
March 22, 2012 ***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTY, ATTY WILL REFILE, MOTION NOW TERMINATED. Document # 424, Motion to stay. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
March 22, 2012 424 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***Unopposed MOTION to Stay re 203 MOTION to Change Venue and Brief in Support Plaintiff DietGoal Innovations LLC's Unopposed Motion to Stay All Deadlines with Respect to Weight Watchers International, Inc. by DietGoal Innovations LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bukovcan, Niknaz) Modified on 3/22/2012 (sm, ).
March 22, 2012 423 Featured Case ORDER granting 421 Motion for Leave to File Reply in Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 3/22/2012. (sm, )
March 21, 2012 422 NOTICE by DietGoal Innovations LLC Plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal of Defendant ABP Corporation dba Au Bon Pain With Prejudice (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Joe, Christopher)
March 21, 2012 421 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Unopposed Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit by El Pollo Loco Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Richardson, Michael)
March 20, 2012 420 REPLY to Response to Motion re 373 MOTION to Sever and in Addition or in the Alternative to Dismiss for Improper Venue or Transfer to the Central District of California filed by El Pollo Loco Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2)(Richardson, Michael)
March 20, 2012 ***FILED IN ERROR, WRONG EVENT USED, ATTY MUST REFILE. Document # 418, Response in support. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
March 19, 2012 419 REPLY to Response to Motion re 381 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction) filed by Rubio's Restaurants, Inc.. (Lee, Robert)
March 19, 2012 418 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***RESPONSE in Support re 373 MOTION to Sever and in Addition or in the Alternative to Dismiss for Improper Venue or Transfer to the Central District of California filed by El Pollo Loco Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Stephen P. Cole, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2)(Richardson, Michael) Modified on 3/20/2012 (sm, ).
March 16, 2012 417 Featured Case ORDER that plaintiff file a notice that case is ready for a scheduling conference when all defendants have either answered or filed a motion to transfer or dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 3/16/2012. (sm, )
March 15, 2012 416 Featured Case ORDER granting 404 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by DietGoal Innovations LLC as to defendant Panda Restaurant Group, Inc., and Panda Express, Inc.. Restaurant Group, Inc., and Panda Express, Inc.. All claims brought by Plaintiff against the Panda Defendants are dismissed WITH PREJUDICE; Each party shall bear its own costs, expenses and attorneys fees.. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 3/15/12. (ehs, )
March 14, 2012 415 Featured Case ORDER granting 406 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re 202 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support Responses due by 3/16/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on March 14, 2012. (rml, )
March 14, 2012 Answer Due Deadline Updated for ABP Corporation to 3/16/2012. (rml, )
March 14, 2012 414 Featured Case ORDER granting 405 ABP's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer complaint up to and including March 16, 2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on March 14, 2012. (rml, )
March 14, 2012 413 Featured Case ORDER granting 400 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 373 MOTION to Sever and in Addition or in the Alternative to Dismiss for Improper Venue or Transfer to the Central District of California Responses due by 3/7/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on March 14, 2012. (rml, )
March 14, 2012 412 Featured Case ORDER granting 399 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 381 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction) Responses due by 3/9/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on March 14, 2012. (rml, )
March 14, 2012 411 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE for pretrial proceedings to Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 3/14/12. (ehs, )
March 13, 2012 410 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David S Becker for Jimmy John's Franchise LLC. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 6-7689) (ehs, )
March 9, 2012 409 RESPONSE in Opposition re 381 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction) Plaintiff DietGoal Innovations LLC's Response in Opposition to Defendant Rubio's Restaurants, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss for lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by DietGoal Innovations LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 7 Errata Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit Exhibit 18, # 19 Text of Proposed Order)(Bukovcan, Niknaz)
March 7, 2012 408 RESPONSE in Opposition re 373 MOTION to Sever and in Addition or in the Alternative to Dismiss for Improper Venue or Transfer to the Central District of California Plaintiff DietGoal Innovations LLC's Response in Opposition to Defendant El Pollo Loco, Inc.'s Motion to Sever and in Addition or in the Alternative to Dismiss for Improper Venue or Transfer to the Central District of California filed by DietGoal Innovations LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit Exhibit U, # 22 Text of Proposed Order)(Bukovcan, Niknaz)
March 5, 2012 407 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 300 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) for Failure to State a Claim Based on Unpatentable Subject Matter MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) for Failure to State a Claim Based on Unpatentable Subject Matter Plaintiff DietGoal Innovations LLC's Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendants Google Inc. and Jimmy John's Franchise LLC's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Based on Unpatentable Subject Matter filed by DietGoal Innovations LLC. (Bukovcan, Niknaz)
March 2, 2012 406 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 202 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support Plaintiff's Fifth Motion for Extention of Time to File Response to Defendant Weight Watchers' Motion to Dismiss by DietGoal Innovations LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bukovcan, Niknaz)
March 1, 2012 405 Fourth MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by ABP Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Fleesler, Gregory)
February 29, 2012 404 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by DietGoal Innovations LLC (Joe, Christopher) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/1/2012: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
February 28, 2012 403 NOTICE by Google Inc., Jimmy John's Franchise LLC re 300 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) for Failure to State a Claim Based on Unpatentable Subject Matter MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) for Failure to State a Claim Based on Unpatentable Subject Matter DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY REGARDING MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM BASED ON UNPATENTABLE SUBJECT MATTER (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Fort Properties, Inc. v. American Master Lease LLC)(Carrano, Cono)
February 28, 2012 402 Featured Case ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Rodney Gilstrap recused. Case reassigned to Judge Michael H. Schneider for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 2/28/2012. (ch, )
February 27, 2012 401 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alyson L Wooten on behalf of Bon Appetit Management Company (Wooten, Alyson)
February 27, 2012 400 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 373 MOTION to Sever and in Addition or in the Alternative to Dismiss for Improper Venue or Transfer to the Central District of California by DietGoal Innovations LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Joe, Christopher)
February 27, 2012 399 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 381 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction) by DietGoal Innovations LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Joe, Christopher)
February 24, 2012 398 REPLY to Response to Motion re 300 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) for Failure to State a Claim Based on Unpatentable Subject Matter MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) for Failure to State a Claim Based on Unpatentable Subject Matter REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM BASED ON UNPATENTABLE SUBJECT MATTER filed by Google Inc., Jimmy John's Franchise LLC. (Carrano, Cono)
February 24, 2012 397 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 296 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Sever the Claims and Transfer Venue Plaintiff DietGoal Innovations LLC's Corrected Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendant Wawa, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Sever the Claims and Transfer Venue filed by DietGoal Innovations LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Bukovcan, Niknaz)
February 23, 2012 396 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 230 MOTION to Sever MOTION to Change Venue Plaintiff DietGoal Innovations LLC's Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendant Rodale, Inc.'s Motion to Sever and Transfer to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania filed by DietGoal Innovations LLC. (Bukovcan, Niknaz)
February 22, 2012 395 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 283 MOTION to Sever the Claims MOTION to Change Venue Plaintiff DietGoal Innovations LLC's Sur-Reply In Opposition to Defendant Domino's Pizza, Inc.'s Motion to Sever the Claims and Transfer Venue filed by DietGoal Innovations LLC. (Bukovcan, Niknaz)
February 22, 2012 394 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case TRANSFERRED to Judge Rodney Gilstrap for all further proceedings. Judge David Folsom no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/22/2012. (ch, )
February 22, 2012 NOTICE of DEFICIENCY regarding the #393 Surreply submitted by DietGoal Innovations LLC. Exceeds the page limit for filing a reply. Correction should be made by 1 business day and refiled. (sm, )
February 21, 2012 393 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE.***SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 283 MOTION to Sever the Claims MOTION to Change Venue Plaintiff DietGoal Innovations LLC's Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendant Domino's Pizza, Inc.'s Motion to Sever the Claims and Transfer Venue filed by DietGoal Innovations LLC. (Bukovcan, Niknaz) Modified on 2/22/2012 (sm, ).
February 21, 2012 392 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 287 Opposed MOTION to Sever and Transfer Plaintiff DietGoal Innovations LLC's Sur-Reply to Defendant Wegman Food Market, Inc.'s Reply in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Alternative Motion to Sever and Transfer filed by DietGoal Innovations LLC. (Bukovcan, Niknaz)
February 21, 2012 391 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 292 Opposed MOTION to DismissOpposed MOTION to SeverOpposed MOTION to Change Venue Plaintiff DietGoal Innovations LLC's Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendant Hearst Communications, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Sever and Transfer to the Southern District of New York filed by DietGoal Innovations LLC. (Bukovcan, Niknaz)
February 21, 2012 390 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 294 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Sever the Claims and Transfer Venue, and Brief in Support Plaintiff DietGoal Innovations LLC's Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendant QIP Holder LLC's d/b/a Quiznos' Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Sever the Claims and Transfer Venue filed by DietGoal Innovations LLC. (Bukovcan, Niknaz)
February 21, 2012 389 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 307 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue to the Southern District of New York Plaintiff DietGoal Innovations LLC's Sur-Reply in Opposition to the New York Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to the Southern District of New York filed by DietGoal Innovations LLC. (Bukovcan, Niknaz)
February 21, 2012 388 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 308 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Joinder Plaintiff DietGoal Innovations LLC's Sur-Reply in Opposition to the New York Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Improper Joinder filed by DietGoal Innovations LLC. (Bukovcan, Niknaz)
February 21, 2012 387 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 296 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Sever the Claims and Transfer Venue Defendant DietGoal Innovations LLC's Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendant Wawa, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Sever the Claims and Transfer Venue filed by DietGoal Innovations LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Bukovcan, Niknaz)
February 21, 2012 386 Featured Case ORDER granting 384 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re 202 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support. Responses due by 3/2/2012. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/21/12. (mrm, )
February 20, 2012 385 Plaintiff DietGoal Innovations LLC's Answer to Defendant DineWise, Inc.'s Counterclaims to Second Amended Complaint ANSWER to 342 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by DietGoal Innovations LLC.(Joe, Christopher)
February 17, 2012 384 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 202 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support Plaintiff's Fourth Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant Weight Watchers' Motion to Dismiss by DietGoal Innovations LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bukovcan, Niknaz)
February 13, 2012 383 RESPONSE in Opposition re 300 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) for Failure to State a Claim Based on Unpatentable Subject Matter MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) for Failure to State a Claim Based on Unpatentable Subject Matter PLAINTIFF DIETGOAL INNOVATIONS LLCS RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS GOOGLE INC. AND JIMMY JOHNS FRANCHISE LLCS MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6) FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM BASED ON UNPATENTABLE SUBJECT MATTER filed by DietGoal Innovations LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Bukovcan, Niknaz) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/14/2012: # 3 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
February 13, 2012 382 REPLY to Response to Motion re 230 MOTION to Sever MOTION to Change Venue filed by Rodale, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Reply Smith Declaration)(Smith, Kevin)
February 13, 2012 381 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction) by Rubio's Restaurants, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Declaration of Frank Henigman), # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Robert)
February 13, 2012 380 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert L Lee on behalf of Rubio's Restaurants, Inc. (Lee, Robert)
February 10, 2012 379 REPLY to Response to Motion re 308 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Joinder filed by Daily Burn, Inc., InterActiveCorp, The Television Food Network GP. (Blackburn, James)
February 10, 2012 378 REPLY to Response to Motion re 307 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue to the Southern District of New York filed by Daily Burn, Inc., InterActiveCorp, The Television Food Network GP. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8)(Blackburn, James)
February 10, 2012 377 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James S Blackburn on behalf of Daily Burn, Inc., InterActiveCorp, The Television Food Network GP (Blackburn, James)
February 10, 2012 376 REPLY to Response to Motion re 292 Opposed MOTION to DismissOpposed MOTION to SeverOpposed MOTION to Change Venue filed by Hearst Communications, Inc. d/b/a Seventeen Magazine. (Sitwala, Ravi)
February 10, 2012 375 REPLY to Response to Motion re 286 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of PERSONAL JURISDICTION, 287 Opposed MOTION to Sever and Transfer filed by Wegmans Food Markets, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Stephen R. Van Arsdale)(Weber, Robert)
February 10, 2012 374 REPLY to Response to Motion re 283 MOTION to Sever the Claims MOTION to Change Venue filed by Domino's Pizza, Inc.. (Cunningham, Thomas)
February 10, 2012 373 MOTION to Sever and in Addition or in the Alternative to Dismiss for Improper Venue or Transfer to the Central District of California by El Pollo Loco Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Mark Hardison, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Stephen P. Cole, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Richardson, Michael)
February 9, 2012 372 REPLY to Response to Motion re 321 MOTION to Sever and Transfer All Claims to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania, 296 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Sever the Claims and Transfer Venue filed by Wawa, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Jensen Decl., # 2 Davis Decl., # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3)(Carter, Winstol)
February 9, 2012 371 REPLY to Response to Motion re 294 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Sever the Claims and Transfer Venue, and Brief in Support filed by QIP Holder LLC d/b/a Quiznos. (Tessar, Amanda)
February 7, 2012 370 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by DineWise Inc. (Schlather, Stephen)
February 6, 2012 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Panda Express, Inc. to 2/24/2012; Panda Restaurant Group, Inc. to 2/24/2012. (mrm, )
February 6, 2012 369 Featured Case ORDER granting 349 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Panda Express, Inc. and Panda Restaurant Group, Inc. have until and through February 24, 2012 to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/6/12. (mrm, )
February 3, 2012 368 RESPONSE in Opposition re 230 MOTION to Sever MOTION to Change Venue PLAINTIFF DIETGOAL INNOVATIONS LLCS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT RODALE, INC.S MOTION TO SEVER AND TRANSFER TO THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA filed by DietGoal Innovations LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Bukovcan, Niknaz)
February 3, 2012 367 DietGoal's Answer to Defendant The Television Food Network G.P.'s Counterclaims to Second Amended Complaint ANSWER to 303 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by DietGoal Innovations LLC.(Joe, Christopher)
February 3, 2012 366 DietGoal's Answer to Defendant Daily Burn, Inc.'s Counterclaims to Second Amended Complaint ANSWER to 302 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by DietGoal Innovations LLC.(Joe, Christopher)
February 3, 2012 365 DietGoal's Answer to Defendant IAC/Interactive Corp.'s Counterclaims to Second Amended Complaint ANSWER to 301 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by DietGoal Innovations LLC.(Joe, Christopher)
February 3, 2012 364 DietGoal's Answer to Defendant Bon Appetit Management Company's Counterclaims to Second Amended Complaint ANSWER to 291 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by DietGoal Innovations LLC.(Joe, Christopher)
February 3, 2012 363 DietGoal's Answer to Defendant Sonic Market, Inc.'s Counterclaims to Second Amended Complaint ANSWER to 290 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by DietGoal Innovations LLC.(Joe, Christopher)
February 3, 2012 362 DietGoal's Answer to Defendant Whole Foods Market, Inc.'s Counterclaims to Second Amended Complaint ANSWER to 281 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by DietGoal Innovations LLC.(Joe, Christopher)
February 3, 2012 361 DietGoal's Answer to Defendant Wendy's International, Inc.'s Counterclaims to Second Amended Complaint ANSWER to 279 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by DietGoal Innovations LLC.(Joe, Christopher)
February 3, 2012 360 DietGoal's Answer to Defendant Moe's Franchisor LLC's Counterclaims to Second Amended Complaint ANSWER to 277 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by DietGoal Innovations LLC.(Joe, Christopher)
February 3, 2012 359 DietGoal's Answer to Defendant McDonald's Corporation's Counterclaims to Second Amended Complaint ANSWER to 275 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by DietGoal Innovations LLC.(Joe, Christopher)
February 3, 2012 358 DietGoal's Answer to Defendant Jack in the Box, Inc.'s Counterclaims to Second Amended Complaint ANSWER to 273 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by DietGoal Innovations LLC.(Joe, Christopher)
February 3, 2012 357 DietGoal's Answer to Defendant International Dairy Queen, Inc.'s Counterclaims to Second Amended Complaint ANSWER to 271 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by DietGoal Innovations LLC.(Joe, Christopher)
February 3, 2012 356 DietGoal's Answer to Defendant Darden Restaurants Inc. d/b/a Red Lobster's Counterclaims to Second Amended Complaint ANSWER to 269 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by DietGoal Innovations LLC.(Joe, Christopher)
February 3, 2012 355 DietGoal's Answer to Defendant Culver Franchising Systems, Inc.'s Counterclaims to Second Amended Complaint ANSWER to 265 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by DietGoal Innovations LLC.(Joe, Christopher)
February 3, 2012 354 DietGoal's Answer to Defendant Arby's Restaurant Group, Inc.'s Counterclaims to Second Amended Complaint ANSWER to 262 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by DietGoal Innovations LLC.(Joe, Christopher)
February 3, 2012 353 DietGoal's Answer to Defendant CKE Restaurants, Inc.'s Counterclaims to Second Amended Complaint ANSWER to 259 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by DietGoal Innovations LLC.(Joe, Christopher)
February 3, 2012 352 DietGoal's Answer to Defendant Chick-Fil-A, Inc.'s Counterclaims to Second Amended Complaint ANSWER to 257 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by DietGoal Innovations LLC.(Joe, Christopher)
February 3, 2012 351 DietGoal's Answer to Defendant Dunkin Brands Group, Inc.'s Counterclaims to Second Amended Complaint ANSWER to 250 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by DietGoal Innovations LLC.(Joe, Christopher)
February 3, 2012 350 Featured Case ORDER granting 347 Motion to Substitute Party. Based on counsels stipulations that El Pollo Loco, Inc. is the correct Defendant, the Clerk is directed to substitute El Pollo Loco, Inc. in place of the originally named Defendant EPL Intermediate, Inc. in this suit. El Pollo Loco, Inc. shall have 30 days from entry of this order in which to file its response to the Complaint. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/3/12. (ehs, )
February 3, 2012 349 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 8 Amended Complaint,, by Panda Express, Inc., Panda Restaurant Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
February 2, 2012 348 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Hindy Dym for Taco Bell Corp..(APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-893) (ehs, )
February 1, 2012 347 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Party Unopposed Motion to Substitute El Pollo Loco, Inc. in Place of EPL Intermediate, Inc. by DietGoal Innovations LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Joe, Christopher)
February 1, 2012 346 Featured Case ORDER granting 341 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re 202 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support. Responses due by 2/17/2012. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/1/12. (mrm, )
February 1, 2012 345 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by CKE Restaurants Inc identifying Corporate Parent CKE Holdings, Inc. for CKE Restaurants Inc. (Baxter, Samuel)
February 1, 2012 344 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Clyde Moody Siebman on behalf of Domino's Pizza, Inc. (Siebman, Clyde)
February 1, 2012 343 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lawrence Augustine Phillips on behalf of Domino's Pizza, Inc. (Phillips, Lawrence)
January 31, 2012 342 Defendant DineWise, Inc. ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against DietGoal Innovations LLC by DineWise Inc..(Schlather, Stephen)
January 31, 2012 341 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 202 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support Plaintiff's Third Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant Weight Watchers' Motion to Dismiss by DietGoal Innovations LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bukovcan, Niknaz)
January 31, 2012 340 Featured Case ORDER granting 328 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; the Court GRANTS the motion and extends the date for Au Bon Pain to serve a response to Plaintiff's Complaint up to and including February 29, 2012. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/31/12. (mrm, )
January 31, 2012 ***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTY, ATTY HAS REFILED (SEE #338). Document # 337, Response. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
January 31, 2012 339 RESPONSE in Opposition re 283 MOTION to Sever the Claims MOTION to Change Venue PLAINTIFF DIETGOAL INNOVATIONS LLCS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT DOMINOS PIZZA, INC.S MOTION TO SEVER THE CLAIMS AND TRANSFER VENUE filed by DietGoal Innovations LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Bukovcan, Niknaz)
January 31, 2012 338 RESPONSE in Opposition re 294 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Sever the Claims and Transfer Venue, and Brief in Support PLAINTIFF DIETGOAL INNOVATIONS LLCS RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT QIP HOLDER LLCS D/B/A QUIZNOS MOTION TO DISMISS OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO SEVER THE CLAIMS AND TRANSFER VENUE filed by DietGoal Innovations LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Bukovcan, Niknaz)
January 31, 2012 337 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***RESPONSE in Opposition re 294 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Sever the Claims and Transfer Venue, and Brief in Support PLAINTIFF DIETGOAL INNOVATIONS LLCS RESPONSE IN OPPOSITIN TO DEFENDANT QIP HOLDER LLCS D/B/A QUIZNOS MOTION TO DISMISS OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO SEVER THE CLAIMS AND TRANSFER VENUE filed by DietGoal Innovations LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Bukovcan, Niknaz) Modified on 1/31/2012 (sm, ).
January 31, 2012 336 RESPONSE in Opposition re 308 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Joinder Plaintiff DietGoal Innovations LLCs Response In Opposition To Defendants IAC/Interactive Corp., Daily Burn, Inc. and Television Food Network G.P.s Motion To Dismiss For Improper Joinder filed by DietGoal Innovations LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Bukovcan, Niknaz)
January 31, 2012 335 RESPONSE in Opposition re 307 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue to the Southern District of New York Plaintiff DietGoal Innovations LLCs Response In Opposition to Defendants IAC/Interactive Corp., Daily Burn, Inc. and Television Food Network G.P.s Motion to Transfer Venue to the Southern District of New York filed by DietGoal Innovations LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Bukovcan, Niknaz)
January 31, 2012 334 RESPONSE in Opposition re 292 Opposed MOTION to DismissOpposed MOTION to SeverOpposed MOTION to Change Venue Plaintiff DietGoal Innovations LLCs Response In Opposition To Defendant Hearst Communications, Inc.s Motion To Dismiss Or In The Alternative To Sever And Transfer To The Southern District Of New York filed by DietGoal Innovations LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Bukovcan, Niknaz)
January 30, 2012 333 RESPONSE in Opposition re 287 Opposed MOTION to Sever and Transfer Plaintiff Dietgoal Innovations Llcs Response In Opposition To Defendant Wegmans Food Markets, Inc.S Motion To Dismiss For Lack Of Personal Jurisdiction And Alternative Motion To Sever And Transfer filed by DietGoal Innovations LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Denying Wegmans Food markets, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Alternative Motion to Sever and Transfer, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit Exhibit 18, # 20 Errata Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit Exhibit 22)(Bukovcan, Niknaz)
January 30, 2012 332 RESPONSE in Opposition re 296 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Sever the Claims and Transfer Venue Plaintiff DietGoal Innovations LLCs Response in Opposition to Defendant Wawa, Inc.s Motion to Transfer All Claims to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania filed by DietGoal Innovations LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Denying Defendant Wawa, Inc.s Motion to Transfer All Claims to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit Exhibit 24, # 26 Exhibit Exhibit 25, # 27 Exhibit Exhibit 26)(Bukovcan, Niknaz)
January 30, 2012 331 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 210 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction) Plaintiff's Sur-Reply in Support of Its Opposition to Tim Hortons USA Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by DietGoal Innovations LLC. (Bukovcan, Niknaz)
January 30, 2012 330 Featured Case ORDER granting 327 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re 300 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) for Failure to State a Claim Based on Unpatentable Subject Matter. Responses due by 2/13/2012. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/30/12. (mrm, )
January 30, 2012 Answer Due Deadline Updated for EPL Intermediate Inc to 2/2/2012. (mrm, )
January 30, 2012 329 Featured Case ORDER granting 326 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. EPL shall have to and including February 2,2012 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/30/12. (mrm, )
January 30, 2012 328 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by ABP Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Fleesler, Gregory)
January 27, 2012 327 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 298 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) for Failure to State a Claim Based on Unpatentable Subject Matter MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) for Failure to State a Claim Based on Unpatentable Subject Matter by DietGoal Innovations LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6))(Bukovcan, Niknaz)
January 27, 2012 326 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer orOtherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement by EPL Intermediate Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Richardson, Michael)
January 25, 2012 325 Featured Case ORDER granting 324 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Samuel Franklin Baxter terminated as counsel for deft Jack in the Box Inc. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/25/12. (ehs, )
January 24, 2012 324 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Jack in the Box Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Robert)
January 23, 2012 323 Plaintiff DietGoal Innovations LLC's Answer to Defendant Starbucks Corporation's Counterclaims to Second Amended Complaint ANSWER to 221 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by DietGoal Innovations LLC.(Joe, Christopher)
January 23, 2012 322 Featured Case ORDER granting 320 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re 230 MOTION to Sever MOTION to Change Venue. Responses due by 2/3/2012. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/23/12. (mrm, )
January 20, 2012 321 MOTION to Sever and Transfer All Claims to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania by Wawa, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Jensen Declaration, # 2 Davis Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Carter, Winstol)
January 20, 2012 320 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 230 MOTION to Sever MOTION to Change Venue Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion For Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant Rodale, Inc.'s Motion to Sever and Transfer to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania by DietGoal Innovations LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Joe, Christopher)
January 20, 2012 318 REPLY to Response to Motion re 210 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction) filed by Tim Hortons Inc., Tim Hortons USA Inc.. (Menning, Trenton)
January 20, 2012 317 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Carl R Roth on behalf of Whole Foods Market, Inc. (Roth, Carl)
January 20, 2012 316 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amanda Aline Abraham on behalf of Whole Foods Market, Inc. (Abraham, Amanda)
January 18, 2012 315 Featured Case ORDER granting 313 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Dft Weight Watchers Motion to Dismiss. Deadline is 1/31/2012. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/18/2012. (ch, )
January 18, 2012 314 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Weight Watchers International, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Artal Group S.A. for Weight Watchers International, Inc.. (Doan, Jennifer)
January 17, 2012 319 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Tynia A Watson for Sonic Corp.. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-884(ch, )
January 17, 2012 313 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiffs Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant Weight Watchers Motion to Dismiss by DietGoal Innovations LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Plaintiffs Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant Weight Watchers Motion to Dismiss)(Bukovcan, Niknaz)
January 17, 2012 312 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kristie Ann Wright on behalf of Weight Watchers International, Inc. (Wright, Kristie)
January 17, 2012 Answer Due Deadline Updated for DineWise Inc. to 1/31/2012. (mrm, )
January 17, 2012 311 Featured Case ORDER granting 256 Motion for Extension of Time to File its response to Plaintiffs' Complaint is extended from January 13, up to and including January 31, 2012. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/17/12. (mrm, )
January 17, 2012 310 Additional Attachments to Main Document (Certificate of Service): 284 Affidavit in Support,, 285 Affidavit in Support of Motion.. (Cunningham, Thomas) Modified on 1/17/2012 (sm, ).
January 17, 2012 309 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Domino's Pizza, Inc. (Cunningham, Thomas)
January 17, 2012 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 298, Motion. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ehs, )
January 13, 2012 308 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Joinder by Daily Burn, Inc., InterActiveCorp, The Television Food Network GP. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas)
January 13, 2012 307 Opposed MOTION to Change Venue to the Southern District of New York by Daily Burn, Inc., InterActiveCorp, The Television Food Network GP. (Attachments: # 1 Blackburn Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A to Blackburn Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to Blackburn Declaration, # 4 Exhibit C to Blackburn Declaration, # 5 Exhibit D to Blackburn Declaration, # 6 Exhibit E to Blackburn Declaration, # 7 Exhibit F to Blackburn Declaration, # 8 Exhibit G to Blackburn Declaration, # 9 Exhibit H to Blackburn Declaration, # 10 Exhibit I to Blackburn Declaration, # 11 Exhibit J to Blackburn Declaration, # 12 Exhibit K to Blackburn Declaration, # 13 Exhibit L to Blackburn Declaration, # 14 Exhibit M to Blackburn Declaration, # 15 Exhibit N to Blackburn Declaration, # 16 Exhibit O to Blackburn Declaration, # 17 Exhibit P to Blackburn Declaration, # 18 Exhibit Q to Blackburn Declaration, # 19 Exhibit R to Blackburn Declaration, # 20 Exhibit S to Blackburn Declaration, # 21 Exhibit T to Blackburn Declaration, # 22 Exhibit U to Blackburn Declaration, # 23 Exhibit V to Blackburn Declaration, # 24 Exhibit W to Blackburn Declaration, # 25 Exhibit X to Blackburn Declaration, # 26 Exhibit Y to Blackburn Declaration, # 27 Exhibit Z to Blackburn Declaration, # 28 Cheah's Declaration, # 29 Smith's Declaration, # 30 White's Declaration, # 31 Madden's Declaration, # 32 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas)
January 13, 2012 306 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by The Television Food Network GP identifying Corporate Parent Scripps Networks, LLC, Corporate Parent Cable Program Management Co., G.P., Corporate Parent Tribune (FN) Cable Ventures, Inc. for The Television Food Network GP. (McSwane, Douglas)
January 13, 2012 305 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Daily Burn, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent InterActiveCorp for Daily Burn, Inc.. (McSwane, Douglas)
January 13, 2012 304 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by InterActiveCorp identifying Corporate Parent None for InterActiveCorp. (McSwane, Douglas)
January 13, 2012 303 The Television Food Network's ANSWER to Complaint (Second Amended complaint DKT 78 ),, COUNTERCLAIM against DietGoal Innovations LLC by The Television Food Network GP.(McSwane, Douglas)
January 13, 2012 302 Daily Burn's ANSWER to Complaint (Second Amended complaint DKT 78 ),, COUNTERCLAIM against DietGoal Innovations LLC by Daily Burn, Inc..(McSwane, Douglas)
January 13, 2012 301 IAC's ANSWER to Complaint (Second Amended complaint DKT 78 ), COUNTERCLAIM against DietGoal Innovations LLC by InterActiveCorp.(McSwane, Douglas)
January 13, 2012 300 ***REPLACES DOCUMENT # 298 WHICH WAS FILED IN ERROR*** MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) for Failure to State a Claim Based on Unpatentable Subject Matter by Google Inc., Jimmy John's Franchise LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Patent-in-Suit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Carrano, Cono) Modified on 1/17/2012 (ehs, ). Modified on 1/30/2012 (mrm, ).
January 13, 2012 299 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Google Inc. identifying Corporate Parent None for Google Inc.. (Carrano, Cono)
January 13, 2012 298 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT # 300 *** MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) for Failure to State a Claim Based on Unpatentable Subject Matter by Daily Burn, Inc., Google Inc., InterActiveCorp, Jimmy John's Franchise LLC, The Television Food Network GP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Patent-in-Suit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Carrano, Cono) Modified on 1/17/2012 (ehs, ).
January 13, 2012 297 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Wawa, Inc. (Carter, Winstol)
January 13, 2012 296 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Sever the Claims and Transfer Venue by Wawa, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Jensen Declaration, # 2 Davis Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Carter, Winstol)
January 13, 2012 295 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by QIP Holder LLC d/b/a Quiznos identifying Corporate Parent QIP Holder LLC for QIP Holder LLC d/b/a Quiznos. (Tessar, Amanda)
January 13, 2012 294 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Sever the Claims and Transfer Venue, and Brief in Support by QIP Holder LLC d/b/a Quiznos. Responses due by 1/30/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Amanda Tessar, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Tessar Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Tessar Declaration, # 4 Affidavit Declaration of Teggie Bellamy, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Tessar, Amanda)
January 13, 2012 293 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Hearst Communications, Inc. d/b/a Seventeen Magazine identifying Corporate Parent Hearst Corporation for Hearst Communications, Inc. d/b/a Seventeen Magazine. (Sitwala, Ravi)
January 13, 2012 292 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss, Opposed MOTION to Sever, Opposed MOTION to Change Venue by Hearst Communications, Inc. d/b/a Seventeen Magazine. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of R. Sitwala, # 3 Affidavit Declaration of M. Weinberg)(Sitwala, Ravi)
January 13, 2012 291 ANSWER to Complaint , [Dkt. 78] Second Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against DietGoal Innovations LLC by Bon Appetit Management Company.(Grant, Bonnie)
January 13, 2012 290 Sonic Corp's ANSWER to Complaint Second Amended, COUNTERCLAIM against DietGoal Innovations LLC by Sonic Corp..(Sullivan, David)
January 13, 2012 289 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Bon Appetit Management Company identifying Corporate Parent Compass Group PLC for Bon Appetit Management Company. (Grant, Bonnie)
January 13, 2012 288 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Wegmans Food Markets, Inc. (Weber, Robert)
January 13, 2012 287 Opposed MOTION to Sever and Transfer by Wegmans Food Markets, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Stephen R. Van Arsdale, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Weber, Robert)
January 13, 2012 286 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of PERSONAL JURISDICTION by Wegmans Food Markets, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Stephen R. Van Arsdale, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Weber, Robert)
January 13, 2012 285 AFFIDAVIT in Support re 283 MOTION to Sever the Claims MOTION to Change Venue of Wayne Pederson filed by Domino's Pizza, Inc.. (Cunningham, Thomas)
January 13, 2012 284 AFFIDAVIT in Support re 283 MOTION to Sever the Claims MOTION to Change Venue by Domino's Pizza, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Formation for DietGoal Innovations, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Profile of Attorney Steven Kelber, # 3 Exhibit 3 - New York Flight Distance Calculations from travelmath.com, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Washington DC Flight Distance Calculations from travelmath.com, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Baltimore Flight Distance Calculations from travelmath.com)(Cunningham, Thomas)
January 13, 2012 283 MOTION to Sever the Claims, MOTION to Change Venue by Domino's Pizza, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cunningham, Thomas)
January 13, 2012 282 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Whole Foods Market, Inc. (Roth, Brendan)
January 13, 2012 281 Whole Foods Market, Inc. ANSWER to Complaint Second Amended, COUNTERCLAIM against DietGoal Innovations LLC by Whole Foods Market, Inc..(Roth, Brendan)
January 13, 2012 280 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Wendy's International, Inc. (Lee, Robert)
January 13, 2012 279 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against DietGoal Innovations LLC by Wendy's International, Inc..(Lee, Robert)
January 13, 2012 278 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by MOE'S FRANCHISOR, LLC (Lee, Robert)
January 13, 2012 277 ANSWER to 78 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against DietGoal Innovations LLC by MOE'S FRANCHISOR, LLC.(Lee, Robert)
January 13, 2012 276 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by McDonald's Corporation (Lee, Robert)
January 13, 2012 275 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against DietGoal Innovations LLC by McDonald's Corporation.(Lee, Robert)
January 13, 2012 274 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Jack in the Box Inc. (Lee, Robert)
January 13, 2012 273 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against DietGoal Innovations LLC by Jack in the Box Inc..(Lee, Robert)
January 13, 2012 272 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by International Dairy Queen,Inc. (Lee, Robert)
January 13, 2012 271 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against DietGoal Innovations LLC by International Dairy Queen,Inc..(Lee, Robert)
January 13, 2012 270 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Darden Restaurants Inc (Lee, Robert)
January 13, 2012 269 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against DietGoal Innovations LLC by Darden Restaurants Inc.(Lee, Robert)
January 13, 2012 268 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Jimmy John's Franchise LLC identifying Corporate Parent JJBC, LLC for Jimmy John's Franchise LLC. (Gardner, Allen)
January 13, 2012 267 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Culver Franchising System, Inc. (Lee, Robert)
January 13, 2012 266 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sonic Corp. (Sullivan, David)
January 13, 2012 265 ANSWER with Jury Demand to 1 Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against DietGoal Innovations LLC by Culver Franchising System, Inc..(Lee, Robert)
January 13, 2012 264 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David M Sullivan on behalf of Sonic Corp. (Sullivan, David)
January 13, 2012 263 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Arby's Restaurant Group, Inc. (Lee, Robert)
January 13, 2012 262 ANSWER with Jury Demand to 1 Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against DietGoal Innovations LLC by Arby's Restaurant Group, Inc..(Lee, Robert)
January 13, 2012 261 NOTICE by Bojangle's Restaurants Inc. - Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Heartfield, J)
January 13, 2012 260 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by CKE Restaurants Inc identifying Corporate Parent None for CKE Restaurants Inc. (Baxter, Samuel)
January 13, 2012 259 ANSWER to 1 Complaint,,,, COUNTERCLAIM against DietGoal Innovations LLC by CKE Restaurants Inc.(Baxter, Samuel)
January 13, 2012 258 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by CHICK-FIL-A, INC. (Aris, Charles)
January 13, 2012 257 Chick-fil-A, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint (DietGoal Innovations LLC's Second Amended Complaint 78 ) and, COUNTERCLAIM against DietGoal Innovations LLC by CHICK-FIL-A, INC..(Aris, Charles)
January 13, 2012 256 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File its response to Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint by DineWise Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Schlather, Stephen)
January 13, 2012 255 ANSWER to 78 Amended Complaint, by Domino's Pizza, Inc..(Angileri, Frank)
January 13, 2012 254 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert L Lee on behalf of Jack in the Box Inc. (Lee, Robert)
January 13, 2012 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Panda Express, Inc. to 2/3/2012; Panda Restaurant Group, Inc. to 2/3/2012. (mrm, )
January 13, 2012 253 Featured Case ORDER granting 248 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Panda Express, Inc. and Panda Restaurant Group, Inc. have until and through February 3, 2012 to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/13/12. (mrm, )
January 13, 2012 252 Answer Due Deadline Updated for ABP Corporation to 1/31/2012. (mrm, )
January 13, 2012 251 Featured Case ORDER granting 245 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Au Bon Pain to serve a response to Plaintiff's Complaint up to and including January 31, 2012. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/13/12. (mrm, )
January 13, 2012 250 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against DietGoal Innovations LLC by Dunkin' Brands Group, Inc..(Smith, Michael) Modified on 1/13/2012 (ehs, ).
January 12, 2012 249 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amanda Tessar on behalf of QIP Holder LLC d/b/a Quiznos (Tessar, Amanda)
January 12, 2012 248 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 78 Amended Complaint, by Panda Express, Inc., Panda Restaurant Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
January 12, 2012 247 DietGoal Innovations LLC's Answer to Counterclaims of Defendant Taco Bell to the Second Amended Complaint [195 ANSWER to Complaint by DietGoal Innovations LLC.(Joe, Christopher) Modified on 1/12/2012 (sm, ).
January 12, 2012 246 DietGoal Innovations LLC's Answer to Counterclaims of Defendant Red Robin International, Inc. to the Second Amended Complaint ANSWER to 193 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,, by DietGoal Innovations LLC.(Joe, Christopher)
January 12, 2012 245 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by ABP Corporation. (Fleesler, Gregory) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/12/2012: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
January 11, 2012 Answer Due Deadline Updated for EPL Intermediate Inc to 1/27/2012. (mrm, )
January 11, 2012 244 Featured Case ORDER granting 241 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; EPL shall have to and including January 27,2012 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/11/12. (mrm, )
January 10, 2012 243 RESPONSE to Motion re 210 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction) Plaintiffs Response to Tim Horton Inc.s and Tim Hortons USA Inc.s Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by DietGoal Innovations LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit Exhibit 26, # 27 Errata Exhibit 27)(Bukovcan, Niknaz) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/11/2012: # 28 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
January 10, 2012 242 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 127 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Sur-Reply to Accord, Inc. d/b/a Taco Time Northwests Motion to Dismiss for Lack Of Personal Jurisdiction filed by DietGoal Innovations LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Bukovcan, Niknaz)
January 10, 2012 241 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement by EPL Intermediate Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Richardson, Michael)
January 9, 2012 240 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by DietGoal Innovations LLC. Sweetgreen, Inc. served on 1/3/2012, answer due 1/24/2012. (ehs, )
January 6, 2012 239 Featured Case ORDER granting 237 Motion for Extension of Time to File Sur-Reply to Taco Times Motion to Dismiss. Deadline is 1/10/2012. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/6/2012. (ch, )
January 6, 2012 238 NOTICE by DietGoal Innovations LLC Plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal of Davanni's, Inc. With Prejudice (Joe, Christopher)
January 5, 2012 237 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Sur-Reply to Taco Times Motion to Dismiss by DietGoal Innovations LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Sur-Reply to Taco Times Motion to Dismiss)(Bukovcan, Niknaz)
January 4, 2012 236 Featured Case ORDER granting 229 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Tim Horton's motion to dismiss up to January 10, 2012. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/4/2012. (sm, )
January 4, 2012 235 Featured Case ORDER granting 228 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 202 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support Responses due by 1/17/2012. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/3/2012. (sm, )
January 4, 2012 234 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David C Vondle for Google Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-861)(ehs, )
January 3, 2012 233 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by DietGoal Innovations LLC (Joe, Christopher)
January 3, 2012 232 Featured Case ORDER granting 191 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft The Television Food Network GP deadline is 1/13/2012. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/3/2012. (ch, )
January 3, 2012 Answer Due Deadline Updated for The Television Food Network GP to 1/13/2012. (ehs, )
January 3, 2012 231 Featured Case ORDER granting 191 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant The Television Food Network, G.P., d/b/a Food Network has until and through January 13, 2012 to answer. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/3/12. (ehs, )
December 30, 2011 230 MOTION to Sever, MOTION to Change Venue by Rodale, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Smith Declaration, # 2 Affidavit McGinley Declaration, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Kevin)
December 30, 2011 229 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 210 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction) Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Tim Horton's Motion to Dismiss by DietGoal Innovations LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Tim Horton's Motion to Dismiss)(Bukovcan, Niknaz)
December 30, 2011 228 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 202 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant Weight Watchers' Motion to Dismiss by DietGoal Innovations LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant Weight Watchers' Motion to Dismiss)(Joe, Christopher)
December 30, 2011 227 ANSWER to 182 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Plaintiff Dietgoal Innovations LLCs Answer to Defendant Rodale, Inc.s Counterclaims by DietGoal Innovations LLC.(Joe, Christopher)
December 30, 2011 226 REPLY to Response to Motion re 127 First MOTION to Dismiss Taco Time filed by Accord, Inc. d/b/a Taco Time Northwest. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Tonkin, # 2 Declaration of Petersen)(Feider, Darren)
December 29, 2011 ***FILED IN ERROR. FILED UNDER WRONG EVENT - ATTY WILL REFILE Document # 225, Sur-Reply. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
December 29, 2011 225 ***FILED IN ERROR. FILED UNDER WRONG EVENT. PLEASE IGNORE.***SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 127 First MOTION to Dismiss Taco Time filed by Accord, Inc. d/b/a Taco Time Northwest. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Tonkin, # 2 Declaration of Petersen)(Feider, Darren) Modified on 12/29/2011 (ch, ).
December 29, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed Third Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Sonic Corp. to 1/13/2012. 9 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
December 29, 2011 224 ANSWER to 177 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,, PLAINTIFF DIETGOAL INNOVATIONS LLCS ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIMS OF DEFENDANT KRAFT FOODS, INC. by DietGoal Innovations LLC.(Joe, Christopher)
December 29, 2011 223 ANSWER to 168 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim PLAINTIFF DIETGOAL INNOVATIONS LLCS ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIMS OF DEFENDANT DOCTORS ASSOCIATES, INC. d/b/a SUBWAY by DietGoal Innovations LLC.(Joe, Christopher)
December 29, 2011 222 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Starbucks Corporation (Chibib, Michael)
December 29, 2011 221 Starbucks ANSWER to 78 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against DietGoal Innovations LLC by Starbucks Corporation.(Chibib, Michael)
December 29, 2011 220 Defendant's Unopposed Third Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Sonic Corp..( Sullivan, David)
December 28, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Panda Restaurant Group, Inc. to 1/13/2012. 14 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
December 28, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Panda Express, Inc. to 1/13/2012. 14 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
December 28, 2011 219 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kellie M Johnson on behalf of Google Inc. (Johnson, Kellie)
December 28, 2011 218 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Wittenzellner on behalf of Google Inc. (Wittenzellner, John)
December 28, 2011 217 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Panda Restaurant Group, Inc..( Jones, Michael)
December 28, 2011 216 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Panda Express, Inc..( Jones, Michael)
December 28, 2011 215 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dianne B Elderkin on behalf of Google Inc. (Elderkin, Dianne)
December 28, 2011 214 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Cono A Carrano on behalf of Google Inc. (Carrano, Cono)
December 28, 2011 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Rubio's Restaurants, Inc. to 2/13/2012. (ch, )
December 28, 2011 213 Featured Case ORDER granting 209 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Rubios deadline is 2/13/2012. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/28/2011. (ch, )
December 23, 2011 212 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by DietGoal Innovations LLC (Joe, Christopher)
December 22, 2011 211 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Tim Hortons Inc., Tim Hortons USA Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Fidelity Management & Research Company for Tim Hortons Inc., Tim Hortons USA Inc.. (Menning, Trenton)
December 22, 2011 210 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction) by Tim Hortons Inc., Tim Hortons USA Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Declaration of Meredith Michetti), # 2 Exhibit B (Declaration of Gesa Wisch), # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Menning, Trenton)
December 22, 2011 209 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re Update Answer Deadline by Rubio's Restaurants, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brogan, James)
December 22, 2011 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee paid by Bau, Lin, Wu, Folvembaum (re #200 PHV application); Fee: $400, receipt number: TXE50000144 (sm, )
December 22, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Domino's Pizza, Inc. to 1/13/2012. 17 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
December 22, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed Third Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Bon Appetit Management Company to 1/13/2012. 23 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
December 21, 2011 208 Featured Case ORDER granting 204 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Lindsey Lauren Hargrove terminated ; Bonnie Grant now counsel for Bon Appetit. Signed by Judge David Folsom on December 21, 2011. (rml, )
December 21, 2011 207 Featured Case ORDER granting 198 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dwayne LeRoy Mason and Tara Melisha Williams terminated. Signed by Judge David Folsom on December 21, 2011. (rml, )
December 21, 2011 206 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Domino's Pizza, Inc..( Cunningham, Thomas)
December 21, 2011 205 Defendant's Unopposed Third Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Bon Appetit Management Company.( Grant, Bonnie)
December 21, 2011 204 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Bon Appetit Management Company. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hargrove, Lindsey)
December 20, 2011 203 MOTION to Change Venue and Brief in Support by Weight Watchers International, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit - Declaration of M. Laginestra, # 3 Affidavit - Declaration of R. Lin)(Doan, Jennifer)
December 20, 2011 202 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by Weight Watchers International, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit - Declaration of M. Laginestra, # 3 Affidavit - Declaration of R. Lin)(Doan, Jennifer)
December 19, 2011 201 MOTION to Dismiss Claims Alleged Against Non-Existent Entity Defendant TCBY Enterprises, Inc. by TCBY Systems, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Stafford)
December 19, 2011 199 RESPONSE to Motion re 127 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Response to Accord, Inc. d/b/a Taco Time Northwest's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by DietGoal Innovations LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Text of Proposed Order)(Joe, Christopher)
December 19, 2011 198 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Taco Bell Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mason, Dwayne)
December 19, 2011 197 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Taco Bell Corp. (Maldonado, Robert)
December 19, 2011 ***FILED IN ERROR, WRONG EVENT USED, ATTY MUST REFILE. Document # 196, Notice. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
December 19, 2011 NOTICE of DEFICIENCY regarding the #192 Response submitted by DietGoal Innovations LLC. Exhibits not properly identified AND attached to main filing per local rules. Correction should be made by 1 business day and refiled. (sm, )
December 19, 2011 196 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE by Taco Bell Corp. (Corporate Disclosure) (Maldonado, Robert) Modified on 12/19/2011 (sm, ).
December 19, 2011 195 RESPONSE to 78 Amended Complaint, and Counterclaims by Taco Bell Corp.. (Maldonado, Robert)
December 19, 2011 194 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Red Robin International, Inc. (McNabnay, Neil)
December 19, 2011 193 RED ROBIN INTERNATIONAL, INC'S ANSWER to 8 Amended Complaint,, (RED ROBIN INTERNATIONAL, INC.'S ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIMS TO DIETGOAL INNOVATIONS LLC'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT), COUNTERCLAIM against DietGoal Innovations LLC by Red Robin International, Inc..(McNabnay, Neil)
December 16, 2011 200 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David J Ball,Robert W Lin,Jennifer H Wu,Martin Flumenbaum for Weight Watchers International, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 PHV Robert Lin, # 2 PHV Jennifer Wu, # 3 PHV M Flumenbaum) PHV PAID for Ball, Lin, Wu, Flumenbaum(rml, )
December 16, 2011 192 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE.***RESPONSE to Motion re 127 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs Response to Accord, Inc. d/b/a Taco Time Northwests Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction INCLUDING EXHIBITS contained in main document filed by DietGoal Innovations LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Denying Taco Time's Motion to Dismiss)(Joe, Christopher) Modified on 12/19/2011 (sm, ).
December 16, 2011 191 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's 2nd Amended Complaint by The Television Food Network GP. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas)
December 15, 2011 190 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lance Lee on behalf of Taco Bell Corp. (Lee, Lance)
December 14, 2011 189 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jennifer A Kash for Rodale, Inc.,Jennifer A Kash for Rodale, Inc.. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-848) (ehs, )
December 13, 2011 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Wegmans Food Markets, Inc. to 1/13/2012. (ch, )
December 13, 2011 188 Featured Case ORDER granting 180 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Wegmans Food Markets, Inc deadline is 1/13/2012. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/13/2011. (ch, )
December 12, 2011 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Daily Burn, Inc. to 1/13/2012; InterActiveCorp to 1/13/2012. (ch, )
December 12, 2011 187 Featured Case ORDER granting 184 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants DAILY BURN, INC. and INTERACTIVECORP deadline 1/13/2012. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/12/2011. (ch, )
December 12, 2011 Answer Due Deadline Updated for DineWise Inc. to 1/13/2012. (ch, )
December 12, 2011 186 Featured Case ORDER granting 185 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendant Dinewise, Inc. deadline is 1/13/2012. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/12/2011. (ch, )
December 8, 2011 185 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File its response to Plaintiffs Amended Complaint by DineWise Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Schlather, Stephen)
December 8, 2011 184 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 78 Amended Complaint, by Daily Burn, Inc., InterActiveCorp. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
December 7, 2011 183 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Rodale, Inc. (Smith, Kevin)
December 7, 2011 182 ANSWER to 8 Amended Complaint,,, COUNTERCLAIM against DietGoal Innovations LLC by Rodale, Inc..(Smith, Kevin)
December 7, 2011 Answer Due Deadline Updated for EPL Intermediate Inc to 1/13/2012. (ch, )
December 7, 2011 181 Featured Case ORDER granting 173 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. EPL Intermediate, Inc deadline is 1/13/2012. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/7/2011. (ch, )
December 6, 2011 180 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 78 Amended Complaint, by Wegmans Food Markets, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weber, Robert)
December 6, 2011 179 NOTICE by DietGoal Innovations LLC Plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal of Which Wich, Inc. With Prejudice (Joe, Christopher)
December 6, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Jack in the Box Inc. to 1/13/2012. 39 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
December 6, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for CKE Restaurants Inc to 1/13/2012. 39 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
December 5, 2011 178 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Kraft Foods Inc. (Roberts, Gerald)
December 5, 2011 177 Kraft's ANSWER to 78 Second Amended Complaint (within time remaining to serve ANSWER to 78 Amended Complaint,, ), JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against DietGoal Innovations LLC by Kraft Foods Inc..(Roberts, Gerald) Modified on 12/6/2011 (ch, ).
December 5, 2011 176 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Jack in the Box Inc..( Baxter, Samuel)
December 5, 2011 175 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re CKE Restaurants Inc.( Baxter, Samuel)
December 5, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for QIP Holder LLC d/b/a Quiznos to 1/13/2012. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
December 5, 2011 174 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re QIP Holder LLC d/b/a Quiznos.( Al-Salam, Ramsey)
December 5, 2011 173 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement by EPL Intermediate Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Richardson, Michael)
December 5, 2011 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Dunkin' Brands Group, Inc. to 1/13/2012. (ch, )
December 5, 2011 172 Featured Case ORDER granting 165 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Dunkin Brands Group, Inc.s deadline is 1/13/2012. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/5/2011. (ch, )
December 5, 2011 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Whole Foods Market, Inc. to 1/13/2012. (ch, )
December 5, 2011 171 Featured Case ORDER granting 166 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Whole Foods Market Inc deadline is 1/13/2012. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/5/2011. (ch, )
December 5, 2011 170 Featured Case ORDER granting 167 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Clay Erik Hawes terminated as counsel for Kraft Foods Inc. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/5/2011. (ch, )
December 5, 2011 169 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Doctor's Associates Inc identifying Corporate Parent Doctor's Associates, Inc. d/b/a Subway for Doctor's Associates Inc. (McNabnay, Neil)
December 5, 2011 168 Subway's ANSWER to 78 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against DietGoal Innovations LLC by Doctor's Associates Inc.(McNabnay, Neil)
December 5, 2011 167 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Kraft Foods Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hawes, Clay)
December 2, 2011 166 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 78 Amended Complaint, by Whole Foods Market, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Roth, Brendan)
December 2, 2011 NOTICE of DEFICIENCY regarding the #164 Application to extend submitted by Whole Foods Market, Inc.. Violation of Local Rule 12. Correction should be made by 1 business day. (sm, )
December 2, 2011 165 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 78 Amended Complaint, by Dunkin' Brands Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael)
December 2, 2011 164 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE.***Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Whole Foods Market, Inc..( Roth, Brendan) Modified on 12/2/2011 (sm, ).
December 2, 2011 Answer Due Deadline Updated for ABP Corporation to 1/13/2012. (ch, )
December 2, 2011 163 Featured Case ORDER granting 160 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant ABP Corporation D/B/A Au Bon Pains deadline is 1/13/2012. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/2/2011. (ch, )
December 2, 2011 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Hearst Communications, Inc. d/b/a Seventeen Magazine to 1/13/2012. (ch, )
December 2, 2011 162 Featured Case ORDER granting 149 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Hearst Communications, Inc.s deadline is 1/13/2012. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/2/2011. (ch, )
December 2, 2011 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Arby's Restaurant Group, Inc. to 1/13/2012; Culver Franchising System, Inc. to 1/13/2012; Darden Restaurants Inc to 1/13/2012; International Dairy Queen,Inc. to 1/13/2012; MOE'S FRANCHISOR, LLC to 1/13/2012; McDonald's Corporation to 1/13/2012; Wendy's International, Inc. to 1/13/2012. (ch, )
December 2, 2011 161 Featured Case ORDER granting 148 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Arbys Restaurant Group, Inc., Culver Franchising System, Inc., International Dairy Queen, Inc., McDonalds Corporation, Wendys International, Inc., Darden Restaurants, Inc., and Moes Franchisor LLC deadline is extended to 1/13/2012. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/2/2011. (ch, )
December 2, 2011 160 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by ABP Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Fleesler, Gregory)
December 2, 2011 NOTICE of DEFICIENCY regarding the #159 Motion to withdraw submitted by Kraft Foods Inc.. No certificate of conference was included. Correction should be made by 1 business day and refiled; motion is now terminated. (sm, )
December 2, 2011 159 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE.***MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Kraft Foods Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hawes, Clay) Modified on 12/2/2011 (sm, ).
December 2, 2011 NOTICE of DEFICIENCY regarding the #158 Motion submitted by ABP Corporation. No certificate of service was included. Correction should be made by 1 business day - motion is now terminated. (sm, )
December 2, 2011 158 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE.***Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by ABP Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Fleesler, Gregory) Modified on 12/2/2011 (sm, ).
December 2, 2011 157 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory J Fleesler on behalf of ABP Corporation (Fleesler, Gregory) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/16/2011: # 1 Receipt # 2-834) (ch, ).
December 1, 2011 156 NOTICE by DietGoal Innovations LLC Plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal of Pfizer, Inc. Without Prejudice (Joe, Christopher)
December 1, 2011 155 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Gregory J Fleesler for ABP Corporation. (APPROVED FEE PAID) (ch, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/13/2011: # 1 Receipt 2-834) (ch, ).
December 1, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Wawa, Inc. to 1/13/2012. 39 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
December 1, 2011 154 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by DietGoal Innovations LLC. Domino's Pizza, Inc. served on 11/9/2011, answer due 12/29/2011. (ehs, )
December 1, 2011 153 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jackob Ben-Ezra on behalf of Wawa, Inc. (Ben-Ezra, Jackob)
December 1, 2011 152 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Wawa, Inc..( Davis, Thomas)
December 1, 2011 151 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas R Davis on behalf of Wawa, Inc. (Davis, Thomas)
December 1, 2011 150 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Winstol D Carter, Jr on behalf of Wawa, Inc. (Carter, Winstol)
November 30, 2011 149 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 8 Amended Complaint,, by Hearst Communications, Inc. d/b/a Seventeen Magazine. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sitwala, Ravi)
November 30, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Sonic Corp. to 1/4/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
November 30, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Bon Appetit Management Company to 12/21/2011. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
November 30, 2011 148 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Arby's Restaurant Group, Inc., Culver Franchising System, Inc., Darden Restaurants Inc, International Dairy Queen,Inc., MOE'S FRANCHISOR, LLC, McDonald's Corporation, Wendy's International, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Robert)
November 30, 2011 147 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert L Lee on behalf of Darden Restaurants Inc, McDonald's Corporation (Lee, Robert)
November 30, 2011 146 AFFIDAVIT in Support re 127 First MOTION to Dismiss by Accord, Inc. d/b/a Taco Time Northwest. (Feider, Darren)
November 30, 2011 145 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Sonic Corp..( Sullivan, David)
November 30, 2011 144 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Bon Appetit Management Company.( Hargrove, Lindsey)
November 30, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Panda Restaurant Group, Inc. to 12/30/2011; Starbucks Corporation to 12/30/2011; Panda Express, Inc. to 12/30/2011. 25/30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
November 30, 2011 ***FILED IN ERROR, WRONG EVENT USED, ATTY MUST REFILE. Document # 133, Additional Attachment to main document. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
November 30, 2011 Answer Due Deadline Updated for CHICK-FIL-A, INC. to 1/13/2012. (ch, )
November 30, 2011 143 Featured Case ORDER granting 135 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Chick-fil-A, Inc. deadline is 1/13/2012. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/30/2011. (ch, )
November 30, 2011 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Bojangle's Restaurants Inc. to 1/4/2012. (ch, )
November 30, 2011 142 Featured Case ORDER granting 131 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Bojangles Restaurants Inc.s deadline is 1/4/2012. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/30/2011. (ch, )
November 30, 2011 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Google Inc. to 1/13/2012. (ch, )
November 30, 2011 141 Featured Case ORDER granting 122 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Google Inc.s deadline is 1/13/2012. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/30/2011. (ch, )
November 30, 2011 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Taco Bell Corp. to 12/19/2011. (ch, )
November 30, 2011 140 Featured Case ORDER granting 120 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Taco Bell Corp deadline is extended to 12/19/2011. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/30/2011. (ch, )
November 30, 2011 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Jimmy John's Franchise LLC to 1/13/2012. (ch, )
November 30, 2011 139 Featured Case ORDER granting 117 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. JIMMY JOHN'S FRANCHISE LLC deadline is 1/13/2012. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/30/2011. (ch, )
November 29, 2011 138 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Starbucks Corporation.( Schenck, Christopher)
November 29, 2011 137 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Panda Restaurant Group, Inc..( Jones, Michael)
November 29, 2011 136 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Panda Express, Inc..( Jones, Michael)
November 29, 2011 135 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by CHICK-FIL-A, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Chick-fil-A)(Aris, Charles)
November 29, 2011 134 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Accord, Inc. d/b/a Taco Time Northwest (Feider, Darren)
November 29, 2011 133 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***Additional Attachments to Main Document: 127 First MOTION to Dismiss.. (Feider, Darren) Modified on 11/30/2011 (sm, ).
November 29, 2011 132 NOTICE by DietGoal Innovations LLC Plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal of Burger King Holdings, Inc. With Prejudice (Joe, Christopher)
November 29, 2011 131 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 78 Amended Complaint, or Otherwise Respond, by Bojangle's Restaurants Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J)
November 29, 2011 130 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Robert T Maldonado for Taco Bell Corp. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-832. (ch, )
November 29, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Tim Hortons Inc. to 12/22/2011; Tim Hortons USA Inc. to 12/22/2011. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
November 29, 2011 129 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Tim Hortons Inc., Tim Hortons USA Inc..( Menning, Trenton)
November 29, 2011 NOTICE of DEFICIENCY regarding the #128 Request for Clerks Entry submitted by Accord, Inc. d/b/a Taco Time Northwest. Pleading was Not signed by atty and no certificate of service. Correction should be made by 1 business day and refiled. (sm, )
November 29, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for TCBY Enterprises, Inc. to 12/19/2011. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
November 28, 2011 128 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE.***Request by Accord, Inc. d/b/a Taco Time Northwest for Clerk's Entry of Default against All Plaintiffs. (Feider, Darren) Modified on 11/29/2011 (sm, ).
November 28, 2011 127 First MOTION to Dismiss by Accord, Inc. d/b/a Taco Time Northwest. Responses due by 12/15/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Feider, Darren)
November 28, 2011 126 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re TCBY Enterprises, Inc..( Ward, Michael)
November 28, 2011 NOTICE of DEFICIENCY regarding the #125 Second Application to extend time submitted by TCBY Enterprises, Inc.. Violation of Local Rule 12 since over 45 days. (sm, )
November 28, 2011 125 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE.***Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re TCBY Enterprises, Inc..( Ward, Michael) Modified on 11/28/2011 (sm, ).
November 28, 2011 Answer Due Deadline Updated for Rubio's Restaurants, Inc. to 1/13/2012. (bga, )
November 28, 2011 124 Featured Case ORDER granting 113 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Rubios time to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint is extended to January 13, 2012. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/28/2011. (bga, )
November 28, 2011 Answer Due Deadline Updated for The Television Food Network GP to 12/29/2011. (bga, )
November 28, 2011 123 Featured Case ORDER granting 111 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant The Television Food Network, G.P., d/b/a Food Network has until and through December 29, 2011 to answer, move, or otherwise respond toPlaintiffs Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/28/2011. (bga, )
November 28, 2011 122 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,,, by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer)
November 28, 2011 121 NOTICE by DietGoal Innovations LLC Plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal of Harvest Farms Inc. With Prejudice (Joe, Christopher)
November 28, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for MOE'S FRANCHISOR, LLC to 12/5/2011. 7 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
November 28, 2011 120 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer, to Move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff Dietgoal Innovations, LLC's Second Amended Complaint by Taco Bell Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mason, Dwayne)
November 23, 2011 119 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by DietGoal Innovations LLC. Wawa, Inc. served on 11/14/2011 by CM RRR, answer due 12/5/2011. (ehs, ) Modified on 12/8/2011 (ehs, ).
November 23, 2011 118 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re MOE'S FRANCHISOR, LLC.( Lee, Robert)
November 23, 2011 117 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 78 Amended Complaint, by Jimmy John's Franchise LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen)
November 23, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Davanni's, Inc. to 12/28/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
November 23, 2011 115 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Davanni's, Inc..( Henry, David)
November 22, 2011 116 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kevin John O'Shea for ABP Corporation. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 6-6016 (ch, )
November 22, 2011 114 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jennifer Scarpati added as attorney for Red Robin International Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-820 (ch, )
November 22, 2011 113 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 78 Amended Complaint, by Rubio's Restaurants, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brogan, James)
November 22, 2011 112 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Patrick Brogan on behalf of Rubio's Restaurants, Inc. (Brogan, James)
November 21, 2011 111 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement by The Television Food Network GP. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McSwane, Douglas)
November 21, 2011 110 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Deborah Elaine Lewis on behalf of Kraft Foods Inc. (Lewis, Deborah)
November 21, 2011 109 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by DietGoal Innovations LLC. Accord, Inc. d/b/a Taco Time Northwest served on 11/10/2011, answer due 12/1/2011; Davanni's, Inc. served on 11/7/2011, answer due 11/28/2011; MOE'S FRANCHISOR, LLC served on 11/7/2011, answer due 11/28/2011; Rubio's Restaurants, Inc. served on 11/7/2011, answer due 11/28/2011; Starbucks Corporation served on 11/8/2011, answer due 11/29/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Rubio's Restaurant, # 2 Starbucks, # 3 Davanni's, # 4 Moe's)(ehs, )
November 21, 2011 108 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer N Scarpati on behalf of Doctor's Associates Inc, Red Robin International, Inc. (Scarpati, Jennifer) Modified on 11/21/2011 (ch, ).
November 18, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Domino's Pizza, Inc. to 12/29/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
November 18, 2011 107 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Domino's Pizza, Inc..( Cunningham, Thomas)
November 18, 2011 106 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas W Cunningham on behalf of Domino's Pizza, Inc. (Cunningham, Thomas)
November 18, 2011 105 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Frank A Angileri on behalf of Domino's Pizza, Inc. (Angileri, Frank)
November 17, 2011 104 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gerald Wayne Roberts on behalf of Kraft Foods Inc. (Roberts, Gerald)
November 14, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for ABP Corporation to 12/14/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
November 14, 2011 103 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re ABP Corporation.( Rowan, James)
November 14, 2011 102 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Richard D Rochford for Wegmans Food Markets, Inc.(PHV RECEIPT 5-134 $100). (rml, )
November 14, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Whole Foods Market, Inc. to 12/5/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
November 11, 2011 101 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Whole Foods Market, Inc..( Roth, Brendan)
November 10, 2011 100 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jennifer N Scarpati for Doctor's Associates Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-810(ch, )
November 10, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Red Robin International, Inc. to 12/19/2011. 45 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
November 9, 2011 99 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Red Robin International, Inc..( Walsh, Thomas)
November 9, 2011 Answer Due Deadline Updated for EPL Intermediate Inc to 12/19/2011. (ehs, )
November 9, 2011 98 Featured Case ORDER granting 91 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. El Pollo shall have to and including December l9, 2011 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffls Second Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/9/11. (ehs, )
November 9, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for DineWise Inc. to 12/9/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
November 9, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Darden Restaurants Inc to 12/5/2011; QIP Holder LLC d/b/a Quiznos to 12/10/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
November 9, 2011 97 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re DineWise Inc..( Schlather, Stephen)
November 9, 2011 96 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephen F Schlather on behalf of DineWise Inc. (Schlather, Stephen)
November 8, 2011 95 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Stephen P Cole for EPL Intermediate Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-800 (ch, )
November 8, 2011 94 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael T Renaud for EPL Intermediate Inc. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 2-801 (ch, )
November 8, 2011 93 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re QIP Holder LLC d/b/a Quiznos.( Al-Salam, Ramsey)
November 8, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Wegmans Food Markets, Inc. to 12/14/2011. 35 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
November 8, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for InterActiveCorp to 12/15/2011; Daily Burn, Inc. to 12/15/2011. 30/38 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
November 8, 2011 92 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Darden Restaurants Inc.( Cook, Jason)
November 8, 2011 91 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement by EPL Intermediate Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Richardson, Michael)
November 8, 2011 90 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Wegmans Food Markets, Inc..( Weber, Robert)
November 8, 2011 89 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert William Weber on behalf of Wegmans Food Markets, Inc. (Weber, Robert)
November 7, 2011 88 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Daily Burn, Inc..( Jones, Michael)
November 7, 2011 87 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re InterActiveCorp.( Jones, Michael)
November 7, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Weight Watchers International, Inc. to 12/20/2011; Jack in the Box Inc. to 12/2/2011. 30 and 46 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
November 4, 2011 86 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Jack in the Box Inc..( Baxter, Samuel)
November 4, 2011 85 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Weight Watchers International, Inc..( Doan, Jennifer)
November 4, 2011 84 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Haltom Doan on behalf of Weight Watchers International, Inc. (Doan, Jennifer)
November 4, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Which Wich, Inc. to 12/8/2011; TCBY Enterprises, Inc. to 12/4/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
November 4, 2011 83 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Which Wich, Inc..( Gourley, James)
November 4, 2011 82 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re TCBY Enterprises, Inc..( Ward, Michael)
November 4, 2011 81 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Accord, Inc. d/b/a Taco Time Northwest, Davanni's, Inc., Domino's Pizza, Inc., MOE'S FRANCHISOR, LLC, Rubio's Restaurants, Inc., Starbucks Corporation, Sweetgreen, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Davanni's Inc, # 2 Domino's Pizza, # 3 Moe's Franchisor, # 4 Rubio's Restaruants, # 5 Starbucks Corp, # 6 SweetGreen Inc)(ehs, )
November 4, 2011 80 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael R Ward for TCBY Enterprises.(APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-795) (ehs, )
November 3, 2011 79 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Accord, Inc. d/b/a Taco Time Northwest, (Attachments: # 1 Davanni's Inc, # 2 Domino's Pizza Inc, # 3 Moe's Franchisor LLC, # 4 Rubio's Restaurants Inc, # 5 Starbucks Corporation, # 6 SweetGreen Inc)(ch, )
November 3, 2011 78 AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement against Accord, Inc. d/b/a Taco Time Northwest, MOE'S FRANCHISOR, LLC, Davanni's, Inc., Rubio's Restaurants, Inc., Sweetgreen, Inc., Domino's Pizza, Inc., Starbucks Corporation, filed by DietGoal Innovations LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (U.S. Patent No. 6,585,516))(Joe, Christopher)
November 3, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Rodale, Inc. to 12/7/2011; Tim Hortons Inc. to 12/7/2011; Tim Hortons USA Inc. to 12/7/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
November 2, 2011 77 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Tim Hortons Inc., Tim Hortons USA Inc..( Menning, Trenton)
November 2, 2011 76 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Rodale, Inc..( Smith, Kevin)
November 2, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for CKE Restaurants Inc to 12/5/2011; McDonald's Corporation to 12/5/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
November 2, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Harvest Farms to 12/4/2011; CHICK-FIL-A, INC. to 12/2/2011; Dunkin' Brands Group, Inc. to 12/7/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
November 2, 2011 75 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re McDonald's Corporation.( Neilson, Derek)
November 2, 2011 74 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re CKE Restaurants Inc.( Baxter, Samuel)
November 2, 2011 73 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by DietGoal Innovations LLC (Joe, Christopher)
November 2, 2011 72 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by DietGoal Innovations LLC (Joe, Christopher)
November 2, 2011 71 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re CHICK-FIL-A, INC..( Aris, Charles)
November 2, 2011 70 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Holly S Hawkins on behalf of Arby's Restaurant Group, Inc., Wendy's International, Inc. (Hawkins, Holly)
November 2, 2011 69 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Dunkin' Brands Group, Inc..( Smith, Michael)
November 2, 2011 68 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Harvest Farms.( Barnhorst, Nicholas)
November 2, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Kraft Foods Inc. to 12/5/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
November 1, 2011 67 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Nicholas Scott Barnhorst for Harvest Farms. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 2-786) (ehs, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/3/2011: # 1 Confidential Information) (ch, ).
November 1, 2011 66 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Kraft Foods Inc. (Hawes, Clay)
November 1, 2011 65 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by DietGoal Innovations LLC. InterActiveCorp served on 10/28/2011, answer due 11/18/2011. (ehs, )
November 1, 2011 64 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by DietGoal Innovations LLC. ABP Corporation d/b/a Au Bon Pain served on 10/24/2011, answer due 11/14/2011. (ehs, )
November 1, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Wendy's International, Inc. to 12/5/2011; Arby's Restaurant Group, Inc. to 12/5/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
October 31, 2011 63 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Wendy's International, Inc..( Lee, Robert)
October 31, 2011 62 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Arby's Restaurant Group, Inc..( Lee, Robert)
October 31, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Pfizer, Inc. to 12/2/2011; Sonic Corp. to 12/5/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
October 31, 2011 61 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Pfizer, Inc..( Vakil, Bijal)
October 31, 2011 60 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Sonic Corp..( Sullivan, David)
October 28, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Taco Bell Corp. to 12/5/2011. 30 Days GRANTED for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
October 28, 2011 59 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Taco Bell Corp..( Mason, Dwayne)
October 28, 2011 58 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dwayne LeRoy Mason on behalf of Taco Bell Corp. (Mason, Dwayne)
October 28, 2011 57 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tara Melisha Williams on behalf of Taco Bell Corp. (Williams, Tara)
October 28, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for EPL Intermediate, Inc. d/b/a El Pollo Loco to 12/5/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
October 28, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Jimmy John's Franchise LLC to 12/5/2011; Bojangle's Restaurants Inc. to 12/5/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
October 28, 2011 56 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen Franklin Gardner on behalf of Jimmy John's Franchise LLC (Gardner, Allen)
October 28, 2011 55 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Jimmy John's Franchise LLC.( Jones, Michael)
October 28, 2011 54 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by M. Dru Montgomery on behalf of Bojangle's Restaurants Inc. (Montgomery, M.)
October 28, 2011 53 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Bojangle's Restaurants Inc..( Heartfield, J)
October 28, 2011 52 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re EPL Intermediate, Inc. d/b/a El Pollo Loco.( Richardson, Michael)
October 27, 2011 51 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jennifer L Fitzgerald for Jimmy John's Franchise LLC. (APPROVED FEE PAID) 6-5595 (ch, )
October 27, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Bon Appetit Management Company to 12/5/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
October 27, 2011 50 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Bon Appetit Management Company.( Hargrove, Lindsey)
October 27, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Hearst Communications, Inc. d/b/a Seventeen Magazine to 12/5/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
October 27, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Burger King Holdings, Inc. to 12/7/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
October 27, 2011 49 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Hearst Communications, Inc. d/b/a Seventeen Magazine.( Sitwala, Ravi)
October 27, 2011 48 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Burger King Holdings, Inc..( Jones, Michael)
October 26, 2011 47 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by DietGoal Innovations LLC. Bojangle's Restaurants Inc. served on 10/21/2011, answer due 11/14/2011; Darden Restaurants, Inc. d/b/a Red Lobster served on 10/20/2011, answer due 11/10/2011; QIP Holder LLC d/b/a Quiznos served on 10/20/2011, answer due 11/10/2011; The Television Food Network, G.P., d/b/a Food Network served on 10/14/2011, answer due 12/2/2011; Wegmans Food Markets, Inc. served on 10/19/2011, answer due 11/9/2011. (Attachments: # 1 QIP Holder, # 2 Wegmans Food Market, # 3 Bojangle's, # 4 The Television Food Network)(ehs, )
October 26, 2011 46 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by DietGoal Innovations LLC. Burger King Holdings, Inc. served on 10/17/2011, answer due 11/7/2011; Daily Burn, Inc. served on 10/17/2011, answer due 11/7/2011; DineWise Inc. served on 10/17/2011, answer due 11/7/2011; Rodale, Inc. served on 10/17/2011, answer due 11/7/2011; Tim Hortons Inc. served on 10/17/2011, answer due 11/7/2011; Tim Hortons USA Inc. served on 10/17/2011, answer due 11/7/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Dailey Burn, # 2 DineWise, # 3 Rodale, # 4 Tim Hortons Inc, # 5 Tim Hortons Inc)(ehs, )
October 25, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for The Television Food Network, G.P., d/b/a Food Network to 12/2/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
October 25, 2011 45 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re The Television Food Network, G.P., d/b/a Food Network.( McSwane, Douglas)
October 24, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Doctor's Associates, Inc. d/b/a Subway to 12/5/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
October 24, 2011 44 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Doctor's Associates, Inc. d/b/a Subway.( McNabnay, Neil)
October 21, 2011 43 Summons Returned Unexecuted by DietGoal Innovations LLC as to InterActiveCorp. National Registered Agents Inc returned service for deft InterActiveCorp stating NRAI can find no record of the entity being listed with the State Authority. (ehs, )
October 21, 2011 42 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by DietGoal Innovations LLC. Whole Foods Market, Inc. served CMRR on 10/13/2011, answer due 11/3/2011. (ch, )
October 21, 2011 41 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by DietGoal Innovations LLC. Which Wich, Inc. served CMRR on 10/18/2011, answer due 11/8/2011. (ch, )
October 21, 2011 40 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by DietGoal Innovations LLC. Wendy's International, Inc. served CMRR on 10/14/2011, answer due 11/4/2011. (ch, )
October 21, 2011 39 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by DietGoal Innovations LLC. Weight Watchers International, Inc. served CMRR on 10/14/2011, answer due 11/4/2011. (ch, )
October 21, 2011 38 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by DietGoal Innovations LLC. TCBY Enterprises, Inc. served CMRR on 10/14/2011, answer due 11/4/2011. (ch, )
October 21, 2011 37 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by DietGoal Innovations LLC. Taco Bell Corp. served CMRR on 10/13/2011, answer due 11/3/2011. (ch, )
October 21, 2011 36 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by DietGoal Innovations LLC. Sonic Corp. served CMRR on 10/13/2011, answer due 11/3/2011. (ch, )
October 21, 2011 35 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by DietGoal Innovations LLC. Roark Capital Group Inc. d/b/a Moe's Southwest Grill served CMRR on 10/14/2011, answer due 11/4/2011. (ch, )
October 21, 2011 34 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by DietGoal Innovations LLC. Red Robin International, Inc. served CMRR on 10/14/2011, answer due 11/4/2011. (ch, )
October 21, 2011 33 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by DietGoal Innovations LLC. Pfizer, Inc. served CMRR on 10/13/2011, answer due 11/3/2011. (ch, )
October 21, 2011 32 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by DietGoal Innovations LLC. McDonald's Corporation served CMRR on 10/14/2011, answer due 11/4/2011. (ch, )
October 21, 2011 31 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by DietGoal Innovations LLC. Kraft Foods Inc. served CMRR on 10/13/2011, answer due 11/3/2011. (ch, )
October 21, 2011 30 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kahala Corp. d/b/a Taco Time. Kahala Corp. d/b/a Taco Time served CMRR on 10/14/2011, answer due 11/4/2011. (ch, )
October 21, 2011 29 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by DietGoal Innovations LLC. Jimmy John's Franchise LLC served CMRR on 10/14/2011, answer due 11/4/2011. (ch, )
October 21, 2011 28 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by DietGoal Innovations LLC. Jack in the Box Inc. served CMRR on 10/13/2011, answer due 11/3/2011. (ch, )
October 21, 2011 27 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by DietGoal Innovations LLC. International Dairy Queen,Inc. served CMRR on 10/13/2011, answer due 11/3/2011. (ch, )
October 21, 2011 26 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by DietGoal Innovations LLC. Hearst Communications, Inc. d/b/a Seventeen Magazine served CMRR on 10/13/2011, answer due 11/3/2011. (ch, )
October 21, 2011 25 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by DietGoal Innovations LLC. Harvest Farms served CMRR on 10/14/2011, answer due 11/4/2011. (ch, )
October 21, 2011 24 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by DietGoal Innovations LLC. Google Inc. served CMRR on 10/14/2011 (ch, )
October 21, 2011 23 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by DietGoal Innovations LLC. EPL Intermediate, Inc. d/b/a El Pollo Loco served CMRR on 10/14/2011, answer due 11/4/2011. (ch, )
October 21, 2011 22 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by DietGoal Innovations LLC. Dunkin' Brands Group, Inc. served CMRR on 10/17/2011, answer due 11/7/2011. (ch, )
October 21, 2011 21 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by DietGoal Innovations LLC. Doctor's Associates, Inc. d/b/a Subway served CMRR on 10/14/2011, answer due 11/4/2011. (ch, )
October 21, 2011 20 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by DietGoal Innovations LLC. Culver Franchising System, Inc. served CMRR on 10/17/2011, answer due 11/7/2011. (ch, )
October 21, 2011 19 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by DietGoal Innovations LLC. CKE Restaurants, Inc. d/b/a Hardee's served CMRR on 10/14/2011, answer due 11/4/2011. (ch, )
October 21, 2011 18 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by DietGoal Innovations LLC. CHICK-FIL-A, INC. served CMRR on 10/13/2011, answer due 11/3/2011. (ch, )
October 21, 2011 17 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by DietGoal Innovations LLC. Bon Appetit Management Company served CMRR on 10/13/2011, answer due 11/3/2011. (ch, )
October 21, 2011 16 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by DietGoal Innovations LLC. Arby's Restaurant Group, Inc. served CMRR on 10/14/2011, answer due 11/4/2011. (ch, )
October 20, 2011 15 Summons Returned Unexecuted by DietGoal Innovations LLC as to ABP Corporation d/b/a Au Bon Pain. The State of NH has determined that CT Systems is not the agent for an entity by the name of ABP Corp. The state lists National Registered Agents as agent fo this entity (ehs, )
October 18, 2011 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Google Inc. to 12/5/2011. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
October 18, 2011 14 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS REISSUED as to ABP Corporation d/b/a Au Bon Pain. (ehs, )
October 18, 2011 13 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Google Inc..( Ainsworth, Jennifer)
October 11, 2011 12 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to QIP Holder LLC d/b/a Quiznos, Red Robin International, Inc., Roark Capital Group Inc. d/b/a Moe's Southwest Grill, Rodale, Inc., Tim Hortons Inc., Tim Hortons USA Inc., Weight Watchers International, Inc., Which Wich, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Red Robin, # 2 Roark Capital, # 3 Rodale, # 4 Tim Hortons Inc, # 5 Tim Hortons USA, # 6 Weight Watchers, # 7 Which Wich)(ehs, )
October 11, 2011 11 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Bon Appetit Management Company, Daily Burn, Inc., Darden Restaurants, Inc. d/b/a Red Lobster, Harvest Farms, Hearst Communications, Inc. d/b/a Seventeen Magazine, InterActiveCorp, Kahala Corp. d/b/a Taco Time, Kraft Foods Inc., Pfizer, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Daily Burn, # 2 Darden Restaurants, # 3 Harvest Farms, # 4 Hearst Communications, # 5 Interactive, # 6 Kahala, # 7 Kraft Foods, # 8 Pfizer)(ehs, )
October 11, 2011 10 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Jack in the Box Inc., Jimmy John's Franchise LLC, McDonald's Corporation, Panda Express, Inc., Panda Restaurant Group, Inc., Sonic Corp., TCBY Enterprises, Inc., Taco Bell Corp., The Television Food Network, G.P., d/b/a Food Network, Wawa, Inc., Wegmans Food Markets, Inc., Wendy's International, Inc., Whole Foods Market, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Jimmy Johns, # 2 McDonalds, # 3 Panda Express, # 4 Panda Restaurant, # 5 Soncic Corp, # 6 TCBY Express, # 7 Taco Bell, # 8 The Television Food Network, # 9 Wawa, # 10 Wegmans Food Markets, # 11 Wendys International, # 12 Whole Foods Market)(ehs, )
October 7, 2011 9 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to ABP Corporation d/b/a Au Bon Pain (Attachments: # 1 Arbys Restaurant Group Inc, # 2 Bojangles Restaurant Inc, # 3 Burger King Holdings Inc, # 4 CKE Restaurant Inc, # 5 Chick-Fil-A Inc, # 6 Culver Franchising Systems Inc, # 7 DineWise Inc, # 8 Doctors Associates Inc, # 9 Dunkins Brands Group Inc, # 10 EPL Intermediate Inc, # 11 Google Inc, # 12 International Dairy Queen Inc)(ch, )
October 7, 2011 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement against Bon Appetit Management Company, Daily Burn, Inc., Harvest Farms, Hearst Communications, Inc. d/b/a Seventeen Magazine, Darden Restaurants, Inc. d/b/a Red Lobster, InterActiveCorp, Kahala Corp. d/b/a Taco Time, Kraft Foods Inc., Pfizer, Inc., QIP Holder LLC d/b/a Quiznos, Red Robin International, Inc., Roark Capital Group Inc. d/b/a Moe's Southwest Grill, Rodale, Inc., Tim Hortons Inc., Tim Hortons USA Inc., Weight Watchers International, Inc., Which Wich, Inc., filed by DietGoal Innovations LLC.(Joe, Christopher)
September 16, 2011 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Niknaz Forughi Bukovcan on behalf of DietGoal Innovations LLC (Bukovcan, Niknaz)
September 16, 2011 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark Davin Perantie on behalf of DietGoal Innovations LLC (Perantie, Mark)
September 16, 2011 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Andrew Carpenter on behalf of DietGoal Innovations LLC (Carpenter, Brian)
September 16, 2011 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric William Buether on behalf of DietGoal Innovations LLC (Buether, Eric)
September 16, 2011 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
September 16, 2011 Case assigned to Judge David Folsom. (ch, )
September 15, 2011 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by DietGoal Innovations LLC (Joe, Christopher)
September 15, 2011 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Joe, Christopher)
September 15, 2011 1 COMPLAINT Complaint for Patent Infringement against ABP Corporation d/b/a Au Bon Pain, Arby's Restaurant Group, Inc., Bojangle's Restaurants Inc., Burger King Holdings, Inc., CHICK-FIL-A, INC., CKE Restaurants, Inc. d/b/a Hardee's, Culver Franchising System, Inc., DineWise Inc., Doctor's Associates, Inc. d/b/a Subway, Dunkin' Brands Group, Inc., EPL Intermediate, Inc. d/b/a El Pollo Loco, Google Inc., International Dairy Queen,Inc., Jack in the Box Inc., Jimmy John's Franchise LLC, McDonald's Corporation, Panda Express, Inc., Panda Restaurant Group, Inc., Sonic Corp., TCBY Enterprises, Inc., Taco Bell Corp., The Television Food Network, G.P., d/b/a Food Network, Wawa, Inc., Wegmans Food Markets, Inc., Wendy's International, Inc., Whole Foods Market, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3227498.), filed by DietGoal Innovations LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Joe, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DietGoal Innovations LLC v. Arby's Restaurant Group, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Kraft Foods Inc.
Represented By: Deborah Elaine Lewis
Represented By: Gerald Wayne Roberts
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Rodale, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin A Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Doctor's Associates Inc
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Represented By: Jennifer N Scarpati
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABP Corporation
Represented By: James Matthew Rowan
Represented By: Kevin John O'Shea
Represented By: Gregory J Fleesler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bojangle's Restaurants Inc.
Represented By: M. Dru Montgomery
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHICK-FIL-A, INC.
Represented By: Charles Kirk Aris
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CKE Restaurants Inc
Represented By: Samuel Franklin Baxter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Culver Franchising System, Inc.
Represented By: Robert L Lee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doctor's Associates Inc
Represented By: Jennifer N Scarpati
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Dairy Queen,Inc.
Represented By: Robert L Lee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DineWise Inc.
Represented By: Stephen F Schlather
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dunkin' Brands Group, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Charles Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EPL Intermediate Inc
Represented By: Michael Ernest Richardson
Represented By: Michael T Renaud
Represented By: Stephen P Cole
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Parker Ainsworth
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack in the Box Inc.
Represented By: Samuel Franklin Baxter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy John's Franchise LLC
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Allen Franklin Gardner
Represented By: Jennifer L Fitzgerald
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McDonald's Corporation
Represented By: Derek Scott Neilson
Represented By: Robert L Lee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panda Restaurant Group, Inc.
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arby's Restaurant Group, Inc.
Represented By: Robert L Lee
Represented By: Holly S Hawkins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taco Bell Corp.
Represented By: Tara Melisha Williams
Represented By: Dwayne LeRoy Mason
Represented By: Robert T Maldonado
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TCBY Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Michael R Ward
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Television Food Network GP
Represented By: Douglas Ray McSwane, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wawa, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas R Davis
Represented By: Winstol D Carter, Jr
Represented By: Jackob Ben-Ezra
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wegmans Food Markets, Inc.
Represented By: Richard D Rochford
Represented By: Robert William Weber
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy's International, Inc.
Represented By: Holly S Hawkins
Represented By: Robert L Lee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whole Foods Market, Inc.
Represented By: Brendan Clay Roth
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bon Appetit Management Company
Represented By: Lindsey Lauren Hargrove
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daily Burn, Inc.
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hearst Communications, Inc. d/b/a Seventeen Magazine
Represented By: Ravi V Sitwala
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darden Restaurants Inc
Represented By: Jason Woodard Cook
Represented By: Robert L Lee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: InterActiveCorp
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kraft Foods Inc.
Represented By: Deborah Elaine Lewis
Represented By: Gerald Wayne Roberts
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QIP Holder LLC d/b/a Quiznos
Represented By: Ramsey M Al-Salam
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Robin International, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer N Scarpati
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodale, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin A Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Hortons Inc.
Represented By: Trenton Lloyd Menning
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Hortons USA Inc.
Represented By: Trenton Lloyd Menning
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weight Watchers International, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Haltom Doan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accord, Inc. d/b/a Taco Time Northwest
Represented By: Darren Anthony Feider
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOE'S FRANCHISOR, LLC
Represented By: Robert L Lee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davanni's, Inc.
Represented By: David Greer Henry, Sr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rubio's Restaurants, Inc.
Represented By: James Patrick Brogan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sweetgreen, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Domino's Pizza, Inc.
Represented By: Frank A Angileri
Represented By: Thomas W Cunningham
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation
Represented By: Christopher Schenck
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panda Express, Inc.
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonic Corp.
Represented By: David M Sullivan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DietGoal Innovations LLC
Represented By: Mark Davin Perantie
Represented By: Christopher Michael Joe
Represented By: Brian Andrew Carpenter
Represented By: Niknaz Forughi Bukovcan
Represented By: Eric William Buether
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: DietGoal Innovations LLC
Represented By: Eric William Buether
Represented By: Niknaz Forughi Bukovcan
Represented By: Brian Andrew Carpenter
Represented By: Christopher Michael Joe
Represented By: Mark Davin Perantie
Represented By: Eric William Buether
Represented By: Niknaz Forughi Bukovcan
Represented By: Brian Andrew Carpenter
Represented By: Christopher Michael Joe
Represented By: Mark Davin Perantie
Represented By: Eric William Buether
Represented By: Niknaz Forughi Bukovcan
Represented By: Brian Andrew Carpenter
Represented By: Christopher Michael Joe
Represented By: Mark Davin Perantie
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]