Stay the Course West Virginia, et al v. Tennant, et al

Plaintiff: Thomas Stephen Bailey, David Bailey, Pineville Lumber, Inc. and Stay the Course West Virginia
Defendant: Scott Ash and Natalie E. Tennant
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv01658
Filed: May 23, 2012
 
Court: West Virginia Southern District Court
Office: Bluefield Office
County: Kanawha
Presiding Judge: Irene C. Berger
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 9, 2012 29 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting the Plaintiffs' 15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. A separate Preliminary Injunction Order will enter this day implementing the ruling contained in this opinion. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 8/9/2012. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (arb)
January 17, 2013 38 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying plaintiffs' 3 MOTION to Certify Class; denying as moot plaintiffs' 18 MOTION to Expedite their motion for class certification. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 1/17/2013. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mjp)
August 6, 2013 51 Featured Case CONSENT JUDGMENT AND ORDER formalizes in writing an agreement entered into by and between Stay the Course West Virginia, David Bailey, Pineville Lumber, Inc. and Thomas Stephen Bailey ("Plaintiffs") and Natalie E. Tennant ("Secretary T ennant") (collectively, the "parties") which is more fully set forth in said order. The parties are directed to discuss the payment of costs and attorneys' fees and to provide this Court with a status report within thirty (30) days hereof. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 8/6/2013. (cc: counsel of record and any unrepresented party) (mjp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Stay the Course West Virginia, et al v. Tennant, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Stephen Bailey
Represented By: Allen R. Prunty
Represented By: W. Bradley Sorrells
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Bailey
Represented By: Allen R. Prunty
Represented By: W. Bradley Sorrells
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pineville Lumber, Inc.
Represented By: Allen R. Prunty
Represented By: W. Bradley Sorrells
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stay the Course West Virginia
Represented By: W. Bradley Sorrells
Represented By: Allen R. Prunty
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Ash
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natalie E. Tennant
Represented By: Doren Burrell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]