Meade v. Parsley

Plaintiff: Shirlean Meade
Defendant: Deidre E. Parsley
Case Number: 2:2009cv00388
Filed: April 20, 2009
Court: West Virginia Southern District Court
Office: Charleston Office
County: Kanawha
Presiding Judge: John T. Copenhaver, Jr.
Referring Judge:
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 99:9999 Report cause code (DO NOT DELETE!)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 31, 2010 140 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying without prejudice the 47 JOINT MOTION for Entry of Final Judgment. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 8/31/2010. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (taq)
November 24, 2010 187 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting PLIVA's 146 MOTION for Summary Judgment and PLIVA is dismissed from this action; and denying without prejudice, as moot, PLIVA's 144 MOTION to Dismiss based on federal preemption. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 11/24/2010. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (taq)
April 15, 2011 206 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying Plaintiff's 202 MOTION to Stay all Proceedings, Continue Trial Setting and for Leave to Conduct Additional Discovery. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 4/15/2011. (cc: attys) (tmh)
April 20, 2011 208 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying plaintiffs' 207 MOTION to Reconsider 206 Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 4/20/2011. (cc: attys;) (tmh)
May 25, 2011 240 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying defendant's 198 MOTION and 201 RENEWED MOTION for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 5/25/2011. (cc: attys) (taq)
November 13, 2009 45 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting defendants Wyeth, Inc and Schwarz Pharma, Inc.'s 34 JOINT MOTION for Summary Judgment; directing that Wyeth and Schwarz are dismissed from this action. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 11/13/2009. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (tmr)
April 5, 2010 81 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying plaintiffs' 69 MOTION to Quash subpoenas; the subpoenas are valid and enforceable, even though their return date has passed; the parties to submit promptly a signed version of the protective order on the Co urt's website; further directing, pursuant to 20 C.F.R. Parts 401-403, that the Social Security Administration shall disclose to counsel for Pliva, Inc. such information in its possession relating to plaintiff Shirlean Meade as is requested in t he subpoena; Pliva, Inc. to submit its affidavit of expenses, including fees, within one week of the entry of this Memorandum Opinion and Order; plaintiff Shirlean Meade to file her response within one week thereafter, and to include a statement as to whether she or one or more of her attorneys who signed the motion to quash is responsible for the motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary E. Stanley on 4/5/2010. (cc: attys) (taq)
April 14, 2010 94 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting the Plaintiffs' 69 MOTION to quash as to the subpoenas for Inez Physicial Therapy and Scott Orthopedic Center because they are moot; further directing that the 69 MOTION to quash is denied as to the subp oenas for Social Security Administration, West Virginia Department of Health and Human Services, and Dr. Jose Auditor, and granting Pliva, Inc.'s 71 MOTION to enforce the subpoena to the Social Security Administration; further directing, pursu ant to 20 C.F.R. Parts 401-403, that the Social Security Administration shall disclose to counsel for Pliva, Inc. such information in its possession relating to plaintiff Shirlean Meade as is requested in the subpoena; denying Defendant Pliva, Inc.'s request for reasonable expenses, including attorney's fees, incurred in opposing the motion to quash and the parties shall bear their own costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary E. Stanley on 4/14/2010. (cc: attys) (mkw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meade v. Parsley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirlean Meade
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deidre E. Parsley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]