Brothers of the Wheel M.C. Executive Council, Inc. v. Mollohan et al

Defendant: Gerald R. Mollohan and John Does 1 through 50
Plaintiff: Brothers of the Wheel M.C. Executive Council, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2011cv00104
Filed: February 15, 2011
Court: West Virginia Southern District Court
Office: Charleston Office
County: Boone
Presiding Judge: Thomas E. Johnston
Referring Judge: Mary E. Stanley
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 11, 2014 183 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying pro se defendant Gerald R. Mollohan's 140 , 141 , 142 , 144 , 148 , 149 , 150 , 151 , 152 , 154 , 156 , 158 , 160 , 161 , 164 , 165 , 166 , 167 , 168 , 169 , 170 , 171 , 172 , 174 , [ 175], 176 , 177 , 179 MOTIONS, as directed and set forth more fully herein, with the exception of defendant's 153 Motion to Appeal; directing the Clerk to docket defendant's Notice of Appeal. With this ruling, the parties may now pu rsue this case 153 -2, 155 in the Fourth Circuit Court of Appeals, which has declined to docket any appeal until resolution of the pending post-judgment motions [ECF 163]. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 8/11/2014. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (taq)
November 14, 2012 59 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER adopting the 31 Proposed Findings and Recommendation; granting the 5 , 13 , 20 , 26 motions to dismiss as to Counts III, IV, V, and VI; denying the 14 motion for default judgment; granting the 15 motion to deny the motion for default judgment; granting the 17 motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot defendant Mollohan's 24 motion for entry of injunction; the parties are DIRECTED to proceed as follows and as set forth more fully herein; adopting the Magistrate Judge's recommendation as to an award of both treble damages and attorney's fees. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (taq)
June 6, 2013 83 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying Defendant Mollohan's 61 MOTION to Stay and denying 70 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal; denying without prejudice Defendant's 79 REQUEST for Final Judgment; denying Defendant's 80 MOTION for Stay on Proceedings Pending Judgment; denying Defendant's 82 MOTION for Leave to File Fupplementary Pleading/Information; the Court awards Plaintiff monetary damages in the amount of $3.00; Attorney's fees will be awarded, if a t all, upon Plaintiff's submission of a detailed itemization of hours billed and costs charged within 30 days of the entry of this Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 6/6/2013. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (tmh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brothers of the Wheel M.C. Executive Council, Inc. v. Mollohan et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald R. Mollohan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1 through 50
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brothers of the Wheel M.C. Executive Council, Inc.
Represented By: Richard J. Lindroth
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]