Wilkinson et al v. Mutual of Omaha Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Susan B. Wilkinson and Lyle A. Wilkinson
Defendant: Mutual of Omaha Insurance Company and Ozzie Roach
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv09356
Filed: April 29, 2013
 
Court: West Virginia Southern District Court
Office: Charleston Office
County: Kanawha
Presiding Judge: Joseph R. Goodwin
 
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 6, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER denying without prejudice defendant's 17 MOTION to Bifurcate; denying defendant's 17 MOTION to Stay. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/6/2014. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (tmr)
May 22, 2014 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part as more fully set forth herein Plaintiff's 29 MOTION to Strike the undersigned's name from Defendant's Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures; directing that Mr. French's name be stricken from the Defendant's Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures at this time; denying Defendant's 31 MOTION to Compel the Deposition of Mark French; denying the parties' requests for other relief at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley on 5/22/2014. (cc: attys) (tmh)
June 5, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER directing that all of the claims against Roach (particularly Count II, but also any other claims that may have been set forth in the Complaint) are dismissed; denying as moot Mutual of Omaha's 6 MOTION to Sever Claims Against Defendant Ozzie Roach from Claims Against Mutual of Omaha Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/5/2013. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (tmh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Wilkinson et al v. Mutual of Omaha Insurance Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan B. Wilkinson
Represented By: Matthew S. Criswell(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Mark L. French(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lyle A. Wilkinson
Represented By: Mark L. French(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Matthew S. Criswell(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mutual of Omaha Insurance Company
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Hayes(Designation Retained)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ozzie Roach
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]