McCormick, et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, et al

Plaintiff: John McCormick and Alice McCormick
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank and Samuel I. White, P.C.
Case Number: 3:2008cv00944
Filed: July 24, 2008
Court: West Virginia Southern District Court
Office: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc. Office
County: Cabell
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Chambers
Referring Judge:
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 22, 2009 52 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 8 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 1/22/2009. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (skm)
February 26, 2009 64 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denied as moot 30 Plaintiff's MOTION to Certify Class; granting 10 MOTION to Dismiss Counts I and III of Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 2/26/2009. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (skm)
March 20, 2009 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 48 MOTION to Compel Defendant Samuel I. White to Answer Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maurice G. Taylor, Jr. on 3/20/2009. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (skm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCormick, et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John McCormick
Represented By: Bren J. Pomponio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice McCormick
Represented By: Bren J. Pomponio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank
Represented By: John C. Lynch
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel I. White, P.C.
Represented By: John C. Lynch
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]