RubberLite, Inc., et al v Baychar Holdings, LLC, et al

Plaintiff: Rubberlite, Inc. and James Allen Mayo
Defendant: Baychar Holdings, LLC, Baychar, Inc., Baychar and Does 1 Through 100
 
Case Number: 3:2008cv01106
Filed: September 18, 2008
 
Court: West Virginia Southern District Court
Office: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending Office
County: Cabell
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Chambers
Referring Judge:
 
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 9, 2010 164 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 111 MOTION for Summary Judgment; denying 112 MOTION for Summary Judgment. The Court further denies the Baychar Defendants' 123 Motion for Summary Judgment except to the extent the Court will not permit plaintiff to argue frau dulent and negligent misrepresentation or omission on the basis of the status of Claim 8 or the scivener's error regarding the corporate form of Baychar Holdings. Counterclaim Defendant James Mayo terminated. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 8/9/2010. (cc: attys) (gan)
February 24, 2009 33 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denies without prejudice 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction; the Court also Grants Plaintiffs request for leave to file a Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 2/24/2009. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (skm)
November 6, 2009 49 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER, granting plaintiff's 44 Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 11/6/2009. (cc: attys) (gan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: RubberLite, Inc., et al v Baychar Holdings, LLC, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rubberlite, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J. Konrad
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Allen Mayo
Represented By: Daniel J. Konrad
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baychar Holdings, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baychar, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baychar
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 Through 100
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]