Bertolotti v. Prunty

Plaintiff: Alexandra Patrice Bertolotti
Defendant: Sandra Prunty, Marshall University, Stephen J. Kopp, Denise Landry, Charles Hossler, James Sottile, Gretchen Oley and Gayle Ormiston
 
Case Number: 3:2009cv00952
Filed: August 20, 2009
 
Court: West Virginia Southern District Court
Office: Huntington Office
County: Cabell
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Chambers
Referring Judge:
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 26, 2009 28 Featured Case FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending: 3 PETITION by Alexandra Patrice Bertolotti for Preliminary Injunction be denied. Objections to F&R due by 9/14/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maurice G. Taylor, Jr. on 8/26/2009. (cc: attys; plaintiff) (dcm)
September 17, 2009 34 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS Adopting 28 Proposed Findings and Recommendations, denying 24 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Alexandra Patrice Bertolotti, denying as moot 3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Alexandra Patrice Bertolotti. This matter is referrred to Magistrate Judge Taylor for further findings and recommendation. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 9/17/2009. (cc: attys; plaintiff; Magistrate Judge Taylor) (dcm) Modified on 9/18/2009 to add text (dcm).
September 21, 2010 96 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 46 MOTION to Dismiss. The Court denies defendants' motion with respect to plaintiff's claims under the ADA and Rehabilitation Act, grants the motion with respect to Dr. Pr unty being individually liable in Count II, and grants the motion with regard to plaintiff's claim for Intentional Infliction of Emotional Distress; as no claims remain against Dr. Prunty, she is dismissed from this action. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 9/21/2010. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (dcm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Bertolotti v. Prunty
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandra Patrice Bertolotti
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Prunty
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshall University
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen J. Kopp
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Landry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Hossler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Sottile
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gretchen Oley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gayle Ormiston
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]