Beattie v. Skyline Corporation

Plaintiff: Heather Beattie and Jonathan Beattie
Defendant: CMH Homes, Inc., Vanderbilt Mortgage and Finance, Inc. and Skyline Corporation
Case Number: 3:2012cv02528
Filed: July 3, 2012
Court: West Virginia Southern District Court
Office: Huntington Office
County: Mason
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Chambers
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 8, 2014 213 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 162 MOTION for Protective Order, as follows: Vanderbilt Mortgage and Finance, Inc.'s motion for protective order seeking to prohibit Plaintiffs from inquiring about topics 6, 7, 8, 9, 10, 11, 12, 13, and 14 is GRANTED; and Vanderbilt Mortgage and Finance, Inc.'s motion for protective order seeking to prohibit production of documents is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 10/8/2014. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mkw)
November 5, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part as to Count 8 and Count 6 4 Skyline's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and 13 VMF's and CMH's MOTION to Dismiss; Counts 4 and Count 5 are Dismissed as to Defendants Skyline and CMH only; Plaintiff's may proceed on the balance of their Counts Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 11/5/2012. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (skm)
December 19, 2014 259 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying as moot Bob's Home Services, LLC's 102 MOTION for Summary Judgment; granting Skyline Corporation's 169 MOTION for Summary Judgment; denying Plaintiff's 182 MOTION for Summary Judgment; gr anting in part Vanderbilt Mortgage and Finance, Inc.'s 190 MOTION for Summary Judgment and CMH Homes, Inc.'s 192 MOTION for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying as moot in part Bob's Home Services, LLC's 177 SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION for Summary Judgment or MOTION to Compel Arbitration. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 12/19/2014. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (mkw)
May 16, 2013 62 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's 42 MOTION to Exclude Evidence and/or to Compel Discovery as to Defendants CMH Homes, Inc. and Vanderbilt Mortgage and Finance, Inc.; denying Plaintiffs' reque st for exclusion of any evidence; granting in part the motion, only to the extent it requests costs and fees associated with prosecuting this motion; directing Plaintiffs' counsel to submit by 5/23/2013 a memorandum outlining the fees and costs for prosecuting this motion; denying the remainder of the motion. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 5/16/2013. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (mkw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beattie v. Skyline Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Beattie
Represented By: Cameron S. McKinney
Represented By: David L. Grubb
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Beattie
Represented By: Cameron S. McKinney
Represented By: David L. Grubb
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMH Homes, Inc.
Represented By: Jason J. Stemple
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanderbilt Mortgage and Finance, Inc.
Represented By: Jason J. Stemple
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skyline Corporation
Represented By: John R. Teare, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]