Wilshire v. Love et al

Plaintiff: Yevette Wilshire and Jeremy Rinehart
Defendant: Brian S. Love, M.D. and Oak Hill Hospital Corporation
Third_party_plaintiff: Brian S. Love
Third_party_defendant: City of Oak Hill, Oak Hill Police Department, Michael Whisman, Jr. and Randall Shannon Prince
Case Number: 3:2014cv08374
Filed: February 7, 2014
Court: West Virginia Southern District Court
Office: Huntington Office
County: Putnam
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Chambers
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 7, 2014 11 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER pursuant to the plaintiffs' motion to stay and to consolidate this case; granting the 6 MOTION to consolidate this case with Civil Action No. 2:12-0622; consolidating this civil action with Civil Action No. 2 :12-0622; Civil Action No. 3:14-8374 shall be designated as the lead case, and the matter shall proceed under that styling; the Court LIFTS the stays in these two civil actions. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 4/7/2014. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (taq)
May 21, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting Plaintiff's 14 MOTION for Approval of Wrongful Death Settlement and Distribution of Proceeds for Claims against Oak Hill Hospital Corporation d/b/a Plateau Medical Center, Inc. and 15 MOTION for Approval of Wrongful Death Settlement and Distribution of Proceeds for Claims against the City of Oak Hill, Oak Hill Police Department, Michael Whisman, Jr. and Randall Shannon Prince; denying Dr. Love's 18 OBJECTION to Plaintiff's settlement wit h the Oak Hill Defendants; directing Plaintiff to file a proposed order outlining the details of each settlement within 14 days of the entry of this Memorandum Opinion and Order. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 5/21/2014. (cc: attys; any unrepresented parties) (mkw)
March 31, 2015 58 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINON AND ORDER granting 55 MOTION AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT by Yevette Wilshire, Jeremy Rinehart to File Exhibit Under Seal; granting 47 MOTION by Brian S. Love for Protective Order or, in the Alternative, MOTION to Quash Subp oenas for Education Records, denying as moot with respect to the defendant's pharmacy records; defendant is granted leave to re-file the motion should the need arise. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 3/31/2015. (cc: attys) (mkw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilshire v. Love et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yevette Wilshire
Represented By: Allan N. Karlin(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Sarah Wagner Montoro(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Rinehart
Represented By: Allan N. Karlin(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Sarah Wagner Montoro(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian S. Love, M.D.
Represented By: Karen Tracy McElhinny(Designation Retained)
Represented By: David Lewis Shuman(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oak Hill Hospital Corporation
Represented By: W. E. Sam Fox, II(Designation Retained)
Represented By: John M. Huff(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third_party_plaintiff: Brian S. Love
Represented By: Karen Tracy McElhinny(Designation Retained)
Represented By: David Lewis Shuman(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third_party_defendant: City of Oak Hill
Represented By: Daniel J. Burns(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Chip E. Williams(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third_party_defendant: Oak Hill Police Department
Represented By: Daniel J. Burns(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Chip E. Williams(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third_party_defendant: Michael Whisman, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel J. Burns(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Chip E. Williams(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third_party_defendant: Randall Shannon Prince
Represented By: Daniel J. Burns(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Chip E. Williams(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]