Macomb County Employees' Retirement System v. Massey Energy Company, et. al.

Plaintiff: Macomb County Employees' Retirement System
Defendant: Massey Energy Company, Don L. Blankenship, Baxter F. Phillips, Jr., Eric B. Tolbert, Richard J. Gabrys, Barbara Thomas Judge, Dan R. Moore, James B. Crawford, Robert H. Foglesong and Stanley C. Suboleski
Case Number: 5:2010cv00689
Filed: April 29, 2010
Court: West Virginia Southern District Court
Office: Beckley Office
County: Raleigh
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 28, 2011 127 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: granting Plaintiffs' 76 MOTION for Partial Lift of PSLRA Discovery Stay; granting the United States' 79 MOTION to Intervene and Stay Discovery, except as provided in the Proposed Order submitted by Plaintiffs and the United States which will be entered and filed herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Clarke VanDervort on 9/28/2011. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (slr)
September 28, 2011 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' 76 MOTION TO PARTIALLY LIFT THE PSLRA DISCOVERY STAY (See 127 Memorandum Opinion and Order). Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Clarke VanDervort on 2/28/2011. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (slr)
March 28, 2012 137 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: denying 94 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint; denying 96 JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint; granting 100 MOTION to Strike Exhibits B-H to the Declaration of Julie A. North in Support of Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 3/27/2012. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (slr)
January 10, 2011 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: adopting the 36 Stipulation...for Consolidation, Appointment of Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Lead Counsel filed 12/17/2010; consolidating 5:10-cv-0689 and 5:10-cv-0776; designating Civil Action No. 5:10-cv-0689 as the lead ca se; directing that this Order apply to the Consolidated Action and to each case that relates to the same subject matter that is subsequently filed in this Court or is transferred to this Court, and is consolidated with the Consolidated Action; direct ing that every pleading in the Consolidated Action shall have the following caption: "IN RE MASSEY ENERGY CO. SECURITIES LITIGATION, Civil Action No. 5:10-cv-00689;" requesting the assistance of counsel in calling to the attention of the Cl erk of this Court the filing or transfer of any case that may properly be consolidated as part of the Consolidated Action; directing the Clerk to (a) file a copy of this Order in any case that arises out of the same subject matter as the Consolidated Action; (b) transmit electronically a copy of this Order to the attorneys for the parties in the newly-filed or transferred case; (c) make the appropriate entry in the Master Docket for the Consolidated Action; directing that each new case that aris es out of the subject matter of the Consolidated Action be consolidated with the Consolidated Action; appointing Massachusetts PRIT as Lead Plaintiff in the Consolidated Action; approving Labaton Sucharow LLP and Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP as C o-Lead Counsel for the Class; approving James F. Humphreys & Associates, L.D. as Liaison Counsel for the Class; withdrawing Movant David Wagner's 17 Motion to Consolidate Related Actions, to Appoint David Wagner as Lead Plaintiff and for Appro val of Selection of Counsel and 41 Motion to Strike Improper New Arguments in Reply Brief, or in the Alternative, for Leave to File Surreply; directing the Clerk to list Movant Wagner as a named Plaintiff in the Consolidated Action; terminating as moot the 14 Motion of Commonwealth of Massachusetts Pension Reserve Investment Trust for Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Selection of Counsel. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 1/10/2011. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (slr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Macomb County Employees' Retirement System v. Massey Energy Company, et. al.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Macomb County Employees' Retirement System
Represented By: John F. Dascoli
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Massey Energy Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don L. Blankenship
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baxter F. Phillips, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric B. Tolbert
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard J. Gabrys
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Thomas Judge
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan R. Moore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James B. Crawford
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert H. Foglesong
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley C. Suboleski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]