Ohio Valley Environmental Coalition, Inc. v. Marfork Coal Company, Inc.

Plaintiff: Ohio Valley Environmental Coalition, Inc., West Virginia Highlands Conservancy, Inc., Coal River Mountain Watch and Sierra Club
Defendant: Marfork Coal Company, Inc. and Independence Coal Company, Inc.
 
Case Number: 5:2012cv01464
Filed: May 9, 2012
 
Court: West Virginia Southern District Court
Office: Beckley Office
County: Raleigh
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Chambers
 
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1365
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 24, 2014 140 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: the Court FINDS that both Plaintiff's sampling from October, 2012 and its sampling from December 2012 prove violations by Defendant of West Virginia's water quality standards and, thus, Defendant's permits - by exceeding the standards' chronic selenium limitation of 5 ppb. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 4/24/2014. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (cds)
April 24, 2014 141 Featured Case DUPLICATE ENTRY - IMAGE DELETED. (cds).
August 22, 2013 98 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Pending are cross-motions for partial summary judgment filed by Plaintiffs 55 and Defendant Marfork Coal Co., Inc. 50 . The Court Grants in Part Marfork's motion as to the lack of standing of three of the plaintiffs, but otherwise Denies the parties' motions. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 8/22/2013. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (cds)
August 23, 2013 99 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 53 MOTION for Summary Judgment in favor of Plaintiffs on Counts Four, Five, and Six of the complaint. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 8/23/2013. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (cds) (Modified on 8/23/2013 to correct image (cds).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ohio Valley Environmental Coalition, Inc. v. Marfork Coal Company, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ohio Valley Environmental Coalition, Inc.
Represented By: Derek O. Teaney
Represented By: Joseph Mark Lovett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: West Virginia Highlands Conservancy, Inc.
Represented By: Derek O. Teaney
Represented By: Joseph Mark Lovett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coal River Mountain Watch
Represented By: Joseph Mark Lovett
Represented By: Derek O. Teaney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Club
Represented By: Joseph Mark Lovett
Represented By: Derek O. Teaney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marfork Coal Company, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Scott Tyree
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Independence Coal Company, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Scott Tyree
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]