McNeilly v. Greenbrier Resort et al

Defendant: Greenbrier Resort, James C. Justice, II, Justice Family Group LLC, Gallagher Basset Services Inc., Kathy Miller, Paul Fogus and Tom Stacy
Plaintiff: Scarlett Faith McNeilly
 
Case Number: 5:2012cv04609
Filed: August 22, 2012
 
Court: West Virginia Southern District Court
Office: Beckley Office
County: Greenbrier
Presiding Judge: R. Clarke VanDervort
 
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 21, 2014 133 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: It is ORDERED that the Plaintiff's 104 MOTION to Compel is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; Plaintiff's Motion to Compel regarding Interrogatory No. 6 is GRANTED and Defendant is DIRECTED to respond to Interrogatory No. 6 by 3/31/2014; Plaintiff's Motion to Compel regarding Interrogatory No. 4, Request for Production No. 2, and Second Set of Request for Production No. 2 is DENIED; Plaintiff's Motion to Compel regarding Interrogatory No. 5 is DENIED; it is ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Compel regarding Defendant's Initial Disclosure Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1)(A)(iv) is GRANTED; Defendant is DIRECTED to produce the information by 3/31/2014; it is ORDERED that Plaintiff� 39;s Motion to Compel as to First Set of Interrogatory No. 1 is DENIED; it is ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Compel as to Request for Production No. 1 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; Defendant shall produce any manager's log or any other such document by 3/31/2014; Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Clarke VanDervort on 3/21/2014. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (slr)
April 25, 2014 162 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: denying Defendant's 106 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 4/25/2014. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (cds)
April 3, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the 34 Proposed Findings and Recommendations of the Magistrate Judge, and ORDERS that: Defendant Greenbrier Resort's 11 Motion to Dismiss as to Plaintiff's "Claim of Negligence of Right to Care of Choice" and "Claim of Failure to Pay for Medical Expenses" be GRANTED, but that Defendant's Motions to Dismiss be DENIED as to Plaintiff's "Claim of Negligence Pertaining to Premises Liability" and as to its request for costs and attorney's fees. Defendant Justice's 12 Motion to Dismiss be GRANTED to the extent he seeks dismissal of the action and DENIED to the extent he requests costs and attorneys' fees. Defendant Miller& #039;s 13 Motion to Dismiss GRANTED to the extent she seeks dismissal of the action and DENIED to the extent he requests costs and attorneys' fees. Defendant Fogus' 14 Motion to Dismiss be GRANTED to the extent he seeks dismissal of the action and DENIED to the extent he requests costs and attorneys' fees. Defendant Stacy's 15 Motion to Dismiss be GRANTED to the extent he seeks dismissal of the action and DENIED to the extent he requests costs and attorneys' fees. This matter be REFERRED back to the Honorable R. Clarke VanDervort for prosecution of Plaintiff's surviving claim for negligence pertaining to premises liability. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 4/3/2013. (cc: USMJ VanDervort; attys; any unrepresented party) (msa)
June 11, 2013 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: It is ORDERED that Plaintiff's 46 MOTION to Amend Amended Complaint is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Clarke VanDervort on 6/11/2013. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (slr)
November 26, 2013 91 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the 72 Proposed Findings and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge and ORDERS that Defendant Gallagher Basset's 40 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Defendant Justice Family Group 's 60 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim be GRANTED to the extent they seek dismissal of the action and DENIED to the extent they request costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 11/26/2013. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (slr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: McNeilly v. Greenbrier Resort et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenbrier Resort
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James C. Justice, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justice Family Group LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gallagher Basset Services Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Miller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Fogus
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Stacy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scarlett Faith McNeilly
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]