Flowers v. Cotton States Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Lynda Flowers
Defendant: Cotton States Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2008cv00345
Filed: May 9, 2008
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Insurance Office
County: Houston
Presiding Judge: Myron H. Thompson
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 19, 2009 60 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER it is the Order, Judgment, and Decree of the court that pursuant to 28 USC 1447(c) this cause is remanded to the CC of Houston Co., AL, for want of subject-matter jurisdiction; It is further Ordered that all pending motions are left for resolution by the state court after remand; The Clerk of the court is directed to take appropriate steps to effect the remand. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 3/19/09. (cert copy: mailed CC Houston Co)(vma, )
March 5, 2009 52 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE it is Ordered that the parties show cause by 3/13/09, as to why this case should not be remanded to state court for want of subject-matter jurisdiction; Show Cause Response due by 3/13/2009. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 3/5/09. (vma, )
December 3, 2008 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 15 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses filed by Cotton States Insurance Company; Motion Submission Deadline set for 12/12/2008, with all briefs due by said date. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 12/3/08. (vma, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flowers v. Cotton States Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynda Flowers
Represented By: Stephen D. Heninger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cotton States Insurance Company
Represented By: Jannea Suzanne Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?