Johnson v. Houston County Jail et al (INMATE 1)

Plaintiff: Simeon L. Johnson
Defendant: Houston County Jail and Jason Smoak
Case Number: 1:2008cv00870
Filed: October 30, 2008
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition) Office
County: Houston
Referring Judge: Charles S. Coody
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 1, 2009 15 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER that the 14 Objection filed by plaintiff on 3/25/09 is overruled. Signed by Honorable Truman M. Hobbs on 4/1/09. (sl, )
December 10, 2008 11 Opinion or Order of the Court RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that this case be dismissed without prejudice for failure of the plaintiff to properly prosecute this action and failure to comply with the orders of this court Objections to R&R due by 12/23/2008. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 12/10/08. (sl, )
November 3, 2008 5 Opinion or Order of the Court RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that: (1) plaintiff's claims against the Houston Co. Jail be dismissed with prejudice; (2) the Houston County Jail be dismissed as a defendant in this cause of action; (3) this case, with respect to the plaintiff's claims against defendant Jason Smoak, be referred back to the magistrate Judge for appropriate proceedings. Objections to R&R due by 11/17/2008. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 11/3/08. (sl, )
October 31, 2008 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full. Signed by Honorable Charles S. Coody on 10/31/2008. (cc, ) Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk @ Houston County Jail.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Houston County Jail et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simeon L. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Houston County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Smoak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?