Bush v. Houston County Commission et al (MAG+)

Plaintiff: Tomorrow Bush
Defendant: Houston County Commission, Andy R. Hughes, Keith Reed, Steve Flemister and Glenn Jones
Case Number: 1:2008cv00874
Filed: October 31, 2008
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Dothan Office
County: Houston
Presiding Judge: Myron H. Thompson
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 15, 2010 104 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER, it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court that plf Tomorrow Bush's 96 MOTION to Vacate or, in the Alternative, to reconsider is denied. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 6/15/2010. (wcl, )
May 11, 2010 93 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION. Signed by Honorable Myron H. Thompson on 5/11/2010. (wcl, )
November 13, 2008 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 11/13/2008. (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bush v. Houston County Commission et al (MAG+)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tomorrow Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Houston County Commission
Represented By: Robbie Alexander Hyde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy R. Hughes
Represented By: Robbie Alexander Hyde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Reed
Represented By: Robbie Alexander Hyde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Flemister
Represented By: Robbie Alexander Hyde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn Jones
Represented By: Robbie Alexander Hyde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?