McNeal v. Houston County Jail et al (INMATE 1)

Plaintiff: Antonio McNeal
Defendant: Houston County Jail, Andy Hughes, Keith Reeds and Zella Jackson
Case Number: 1:2009cv00641
Filed: July 9, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Dothan Office
County: Houston
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Referring Judge: Susan Russ Walker
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 16, 2009 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION ADOPTING 18 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and the defendants' motion for summary judgment is GRANTED to the extent that defendants seek dismissal of this case due to the plaintiff's failure to properly exhaust administrative remedies previously available to him at the Houston County Jail. This case is DISMISSED with prejudice in accordance with the provisions of 42 U.S.C. § 1997e(a) for the plaintiffs failure to properly exhaust administrative remedies previously available to him at the Houston County Jail. Signed by Honorable Truman M. Hobbs on 11/16/2009. (dmn)
October 21, 2009 18 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 1 Inmate 1983 Complaint filed by Antonio McNeal that: 1. The defendants' MOTION for Summary Judgment be GRANTED to the extent the defendants seek dismissal of this case due to the plaintiff's failure to proper ly exhaust administrative remedies previously available to him at the Houston County Jail. 2. This case be dismissed with prejudice in accordance with the provisions of 42 U.S.C. § 1997e(a) for the plaintiff's failure to properly exhaust administrative remedies previously available to him at the Houston County Jail. Objections to R&R due by 11/3/2009. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 10/21/2009. (dmn)
September 18, 2009 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION: It is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the 14 RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge be and is hereby ADOPTED and that: 1. The plaintiff's claims against the Houston County Jail are DISMISSED with prejudice in accordance with the d irectives of 28 U.S.C. 1915(3)(2)(B)(I). 2. The Houston County Jail is DISMISSED as a defendant in this cause of action. 3. This case, with respect to the plaintiff's claims against the remaining defendants regarding the conditions of confinement at the Houston County Jail is REFERRED back to the Magistrate Judge for appropriate proceedings. Signed by Honorable Truman M. Hobbs on 9/18/2009. (dmn)
August 17, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Inmate 1983 Complaint and Amendment to Complaint filed by Antonio McNeal, that: 1. The plaintiff's claims against the Houston County Jail be dismissed with prejudice in accordance with the directives of 28 U.S.C . 1915(e)(2)(B)(i). 2. The Houston County Jail be dismissed as a defendant in this cause of action. 3. This case, with respect to the plaintiff's claims against the remaining defendants regarding the conditions of confinement at the Houston County Jail, be referred back to the undersigned for appropriate proceedings. Objections to R&R due by 8/31/2009. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 8/17/2009. (dmn)
July 10, 2009 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at Houston County Jail. Signed by Honorable Susan Russ Walker on 7/10/2009. (dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McNeal v. Houston County Jail et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio McNeal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Houston County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Reeds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zella Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?