Gaskins v. Montgomery Department of Correction et al

Plaintiff: Jerry Jerome Gaskins
Defendant: Montgomery Department of Correction and Andy Hughes
Case Number: 1:2009cv01058
Filed: November 16, 2009
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Dothan Office
County: Houston
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 6, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 17 Report and Recommendations; that defendant's 15 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED to the extent Defendant seeks dismissal of this case due to Plaintiff's failure to properly exhaust an administrative remedy previo usly available to him at the Houston County Jail; that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to the provisions of 42 U.S.C. § 1997e(a) due to the Plaintiff's failure to exhaust administrative remedies. Signed by Honorable Truman M. Hobbs on 4/6/2010. (cc, )
December 29, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING the 8 RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge; DISMISSING the Plaintiff's claims against the Alabama Department of Corrections with prejudice, and DISMISSING the Alabama Department of Corrections as a defendant in this cause of a ction; referring this case back to Magistrate Judge for appropriate proceedings with respect to Plaintiff's claim regarding the validity of his incarceration in the Houston County Jail on a state detainer. Signed by Honorable Truman M. Hobbs on 12/29/2009. (br, )
November 18, 2009 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that on or before December 9, 2009 the plaintiff shall file an amendment to his complaint in which he identifies the entity which issued the detainer about which he complains. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 11/18/09. (br, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gaskins v. Montgomery Department of Correction et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Jerome Gaskins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montgomery Department of Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?