Powell v. Reed et al (INMATE 2)

Plaintiff: Kelvin Powell
Defendant: Keith Reed, Andy Hughes and Jason Smote
Case Number: 1:2011cv00102
Filed: February 11, 2011
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Dothan Office
County: Houston
Presiding Judge: Ira De Ment
Referring Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 5, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the 14 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED. This matter is DISMISSED without prejudice due to Plaintiff's abandonment of his claims, failure to comply with the orders of this court, and failure to properly continue prosecution of this cause of action. A separate judgment shall issue. Signed by Honorable Ira De Ment on 5/5/2011. (dmn)
March 21, 2011 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 5 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge. Plaintiffs claims against the Houston County Jail are DISMISSED with prejudice, prior to service of process, pursuant to the provisions of 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i). The Houston County Jail is DISMISSED as a party to this complaint, and this case, with respect to the remaining defendants, is REFERRED back to the Magistrate Judge for additional proceedings. Signed by Honorable Ira De Ment on 3/21/2011. (dmn)
February 23, 2011 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at the Houston County Jail. Signed by Honorable Wallace Capel, Jr on 2/23/2011. (cc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Powell v. Reed et al (INMATE 2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelvin Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Reed
Represented By: Gary Clayborn Sherrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Hughes
Represented By: Gary Clayborn Sherrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Smote
Represented By: Gary Clayborn Sherrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?