McCall, et al. v. Houston County, et al.

Plaintiff: Tracey McCall
Defendant: Houston County, Houston County Sheriff's Department, Andy Hughes, Keith Reed, Ronnie Phillips, James West, Ronnie Dye, Kizzie Foster, Chris Harrison and Ashleigh Kennedy
Case Number: 1:2011cv00559
Filed: July 12, 2011
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Dothan Office
County: Geneva
Presiding Judge: Wallace Capel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 2, 2015 225 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that, in accordance with the opinion entered this date, it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court as follows: (1) Plaintiff Tracey McCall's motion to set aside (doc. no. 207 ) is granted; (2) The judgment entered on September 3, 2014 (doc. no. 205 ), is set aside, and this case is reopened, except that the stay remains dissolved; (3) A.E.M., a minor, is added as a plaintiff. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on July 2, 2015. (scn, )
June 29, 2015 223 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that plaintiff Tracey McCall's motion for leave to file a supplemental response to the report of the guardian ad litem (doc. no. 219 ) is granted. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on June 29, 2015. (scn, )
May 26, 2015 212 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court as follows: (1) Plaintiff Tracey McCall's 207 motion under Rule 60(b) for leave to file a motion a for pro ami hearing is treated as both (a) a motion for leave to file a mot ion for a pro ami hearing and (b) a Rule 60(b) motion to set aside the dismissal judgment in this case. (2) Plaintiff McCall's 207 motion for leave to file a motion for a pro ami hearing and 208 motion for a pro ami hearing are conditionall y granted. (3) William C. Maddox, Esq., 567 West Main Street, Dothan, Alabama, 36301, 334.678.8100, <chrismaddox@graceba.net>, is appointed as guardian ad litem for the minor in this case. (4) By agreement of the parties, the defendants ar e to pay the attorney's fees and expenses of the guardian ad litem, with those fees and expenses not to be subtracted from the amount of the proposed settlement. (5) The clerk of the court is to arrange for the guardian ad litem to receive a cop y of the file in this case. (6) An on-the-record hearing on the Rule 60(b) 207 motion to set aside the dismissal judgment and, if granted, on the proposed fairness of the settlement to the minor is set for June 16, 2015, at 10:00 a.m. Counsel for t he parties are to arrange for the hearing to be conducted by telephone. Counsel for all parties, the minor's mother, and the guardian ad litem are to be available for the hearing. (7) On or before June 10, 2015, the guardian ad litem is to file a report that addresses all the issues raised in this opinion regarding whether the court should grant the Rule 60(b) 207 motion to set aside the dismissal judgment and, if so, whether the court should approve the proposed settlement for the minor. On or before June 12, 2015, the parties are to file their responses to the report. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 5/26/2015. (furn: Calendar, AG, Finance)(Case file sent via CM/ECF to Attorney Maddox.)(kh, )
June 30, 2014 181 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 82 MOTION to Strike the 80 Answer or to show cause, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 6/30/14. (djy, )
January 15, 2014 130 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL HEARING on February 11, 2014, at 10:00 a.m. in Chambers 200FMJ, Frank M. Johnson, Jr. U. S. Courthouse Complex, One Church Street, Montgomery, Alabama; the parties are DIRECTED to prepare JOINTLY a proposed pretrial order in accordance with the attached outline; TRIAL TERM COMMENCES March 10, 2014, in Dothan, Alabama. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 1/15/14. (Furnished to Calendar/AG)(scn, )
March 29, 2013 68 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER directing that the 55 motion to dismiss is denied, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 3/29/13. (scn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCall, et al. v. Houston County, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracey McCall
Represented By: Toni Jacqueline Braxton
Represented By: Samuel Fisher
Represented By: Charles Neville Reese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Houston County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Houston County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie Dye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kizzie Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashleigh Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?