Robinson v. Hughes, et al (INMATE 1)

Plaintiff: James Robinson
Defendant: Rhonda Mayes, Kim Turner, Commander Reed, Co. Grant, Co. Scott, Andy Hughes, Ms. Dunlap and Douglas A. Valesna
Case Number: 1:2011cv00681
Filed: August 23, 2011
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Dothan Office
County: Houston
Presiding Judge: Truman M. Hobbs
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 4, 2013 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that, upon an independent review of the file in this case and upon consideration of the Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge, it is theORDER, JUDGMENT and DECREE of the court that: (1) The 69 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED; (2) The plaintiff's 68 motion to dismiss is GRANTED and this case is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 12/4/13. (scn, )
October 4, 2011 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing that, upon review of the 16 motion for order to cease, and for good cause, it is ORDERED that on or before October 19, 2011 the defendants shall show cause why this motion should not be GRANTED; the Clerk is DIRECTED to provide a copy of the aforementioned motion and this order to defendant Hughes. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 10/4/11. (Order and 16 motion mailed CMRRR to Defendant Hughes)(scn, )
August 25, 2011 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk at the Houston County Jail. Signed by Honorable Judge Terry F. Moorer on 8/25/11. (Furnished to cashier and finance.) (scn, ) Modified on 8/25/2011 (scn, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Hughes, et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhonda Mayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commander Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Co. Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Co. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Dunlap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas A. Valesna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?