Lee v. Houston County, Alabama et al

Plaintiff: Ressie Nicole Lee
Defendant: Officer Hunter, Houston County, Alabama, Andy Hughes, Keith Reed, Officer Sap and Officer Champion
Case Number: 1:2012cv01018
Filed: November 20, 2012
Court: Alabama Middle District Court
Office: Dothan Office
County: Houston
Presiding Judge: Mark E. Fuller
Referring Judge: Terry F. Moorer
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 4, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: it is hereby ORDERED that Dfts' 22 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies is GRANTED, and Plf's claims against Sheriff Andy Hughes, Commander Deputy Keith Reed, and Corrections Deputies Tammy Sapp, Michael Champion, and Tracey Hunter are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; A separate final judgment is forthcoming. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 9/4/2013. (wcl, )
April 26, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that (1) Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Additional Affidavit Out of Time 32 is GRANTED; and (2) Defendants' previously filed Motion for Extension of Time 28 is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 4/26/2013. (jg, )
December 6, 2012 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 3 Motion to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Honorable Judge Mark E. Fuller on 12/6/2012. (wcl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Houston County, Alabama et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Hunter
Represented By: Gary Clayborn Sherrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Houston County, Alabama
Represented By: Gary Clayborn Sherrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Hughes
Represented By: Gary Clayborn Sherrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Reed
Represented By: Gary Clayborn Sherrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Sap
Represented By: Gary Clayborn Sherrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Champion
Represented By: Gary Clayborn Sherrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ressie Nicole Lee
Represented By: Mark Andrew Overall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?