Mathis v. Valenza et al (INMATE 1)
Plaintiff: Raymond Mathis
Defendant: Donald Valenza, Tony Weber, Jason Smoak and James Brazier
Case Number: 1:2020cv00351
Filed: May 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Charles S Coody
Referring Judge: R Austin Huffaker
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDERED that this #8 motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that these defendants are GRANTED an extension from July 8, 2020 to and including August 17, 2020 to file their special report and answer. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 7/8/2020. (kh, )
July 8, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Jason Smoak. (Hill, Charles)
July 8, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Donald Valenza. (Hill, Charles)
July 8, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by James Brazier. (Hill, Charles)
July 8, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Special Report & Answer by James Brazier, Jason Smoak, Donald Valenza. (Hill, Charles)
July 8, 2020 AO FORM 85 mailed to counsel for James Brazier, Jason Smoak, Donald Valenza (no pdf document attached to this entry) (kh, )
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDERED that the plaintiff be allowed until July 15, 2020 to furnish the clerk's office with the correct address of Tony Weber so that the court may again attempt to perfect service on this individual. The plaintiff is advised that the court will not continue to monitor this case to ensure that the defendants he wishes to sue have been served. This is the plaintiffs responsibility. Moreover, the plaintiff is specifically cautioned that if service is not perfected on a defendant he will not be considered a party to this cause of action, the court will on its own initiative dismiss any defendant on whom service is not perfected and this case will proceed against only the defendants on whom service has been perfected. See Rule 4(m), Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 6/9/2020. (kh, )
June 8, 2020 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. #1 Inmate 1983 complaint and #4 Order mailed to Tony Weber, Commissioner returned by USPS with the following notation, "Return to Sender, Attempted Not Known, Unable to Forward." (dmn, ) (no pdf)
June 8, 2020 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. #1 Inmate 1983 complaint and #4 Order mailed to Donald Valenza returned by USPS with the following notation, "Return to Sender, Attempted, Not Known, Unable to Forward." (dmn, ) (no pdf)
June 4, 2020 Filing 6 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Inmate 1983 Complaint and #4 Order signed by Cynthia Telfair for Jason Smoak served on 6/2/2020, answer due 7/8/2020. (wcl, )
June 3, 2020 Filing 5 Return Receipt Card showing service of #1 Complaint and #4 Order signed by (illegible) for James Brazier served on 6/2/2020, answer due 7/8/2020. (kh, )
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO FILE SPECIAL REPORT AND ANSWER on or before July 8, 2020; copies mailed to plaintiff; mailed by CMRRR with complaint to named defendants. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 5/29/2020. (kh, )
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Affidavit for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis except to the extent payment is required under this order; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full; Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk @ Houston County Jail. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 5/29/2020. (furn: account clerk, cashier)(kh, )
May 28, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Raymond Mathis. (es, )
May 28, 2020 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against James Brazier, Jason Smoak, Donald Valenza, Tony Weber, filed by Raymond Mathis.(es, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mathis v. Valenza et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Valenza
Represented By: Charles Richard Hill, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Smoak
Represented By: Charles Richard Hill, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Brazier
Represented By: Charles Richard Hill, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Mathis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?